Burton v. Barnes et al
Plaintiff: Harrison L. Burton
Defendant: F. Leckie, J. Chenoweth and Ron Barnes
Case Number: 2:2013cv00167
Filed: January 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/21/14 ORDERING that Plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal (Doc. No. 14 ) is denied; Plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel on appeal (Doc. No. 13 ) is denied without p rejudice to its renewal before the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on plaintiff and on the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. (cc Ninth Circuit)(Dillon, M)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/13/2014 DENYING plaintiff's 6 motion to proceed IFP; plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice as Heck-barred; and this action is CLOSED. (Yin, K)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 02/26/13 ordering plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, either the $350.00 filing fee or a properly completed application to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided with this order. The clerk of the court shall send plaintiff an application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner for use in a civil rights action. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton v. Barnes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harrison L. Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Leckie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Chenoweth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?