Cha v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Mee Cha
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2013cv00179
Filed: January 29, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/2/14 ORDERING that the 4/22/14 order concerning EAJA fees is withdrawn. The defendant shall pay plaintiff's attorney fees pursuant to the EAJA in accordance with this stipulation. (Manzer, C)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 31 Motion for Attorney Fees signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/22/14. (Kaminski, H)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/19/14 ORDERING that the order 26 filed 2/7/2014 and the judgment entered thereon 27 are amended as follows: Plaintiff's 13 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED; the Commissioner's 22 cross-motion for summary judgment is DENIED; and benefits shall be reinstated without further agency proceedings. (Kastilahn, A)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/4/14: Opposition, if any, to 28 MOTION to AMEND the JUDGMENT shall be filed no later than March 17, 2014. (Kaminski, H)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/7/2014 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 13 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. The Commissioner's 22 cross-motion for summary judgment is DENIED. This matter is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this order. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/12/13 ORDERING that plaintiff's time to file a reply brief is extended to 11/8/2013. (Kastilahn, A)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/2/13 ORDERING that the Commissioner of Social Security's Motion to Stay 19 is GRANTED; CASE STAYED. Case Management Deadline: 4/3/2014. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/10/2013 ORDERING the defendant to file her Motion for Summary Judgment by 10/7/2013. (Michel, G)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/15/2013 13 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Mee Cha ORDERING defendant shall, no later than 9/18/2013, file an amended court transcript index, specifically itemizing the records contained in the administrative transcript. (Waggoner, D)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/30/13 GRANTING 3 Motion to Proceed IFP. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in social security cases; the Clerk of the Court is FURTHER DIRECT ED to serve a copy of this order on the U.S. Marshal. Within 15 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the U.S. Marshal a completed summons and copies of the complaint and to file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the U.S. Marshal. The U.S. Marshal is DIRECTED to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than 60 days from the date of this order. (Meuleman, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cha v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mee Cha
Represented By: Jesse S. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Represented By: Jeffrey T Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?