Gregory et al v. City of Vallejo, CA et al
Plaintiff: Erika Gregory and Loren Mollner
Defendant: City of Vallejo, Robert Nichelini, Joseph Kreins and Chase Calhoun
Case Number: 2:2013cv00320
Filed: February 20, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/27/15 ORDERING that defendant Chase Calhoun's 117 unopposed motion to seal trial transcript of Sarah Elmossalamy's testimony is DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
January 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 98 PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/26/2015. (Zignago, K.)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/22/2015 re Tentative Ruling of 70 MOTION IN LIMINE No. 4. (Donati, J)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/9/2015 DENYING 55 Motion to Reopen Discovery. (Donati, J)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/27/14. (Kaminski, H)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ON REQUEST TO SEAL DOCUMENT(S) signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/20/14. Request to seal is DENIED and within 1 day plaintiffs shall file their opposition papers in accordance with this order, redacting only the names of third parties. (Manzer, C)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/19/14. (Kaminski, H)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/14/2014 ORDERING Within 30 days of this order, the City of Vallejo shall produce any portion of officer Chase Calhoun's personnel file that relates to the investigation of, and reasons for, his termination. In ordering the production of these documents, the court expresses no opinion concerning their ultimate admissibility, but merely finds, for purposes of discovery, that such documents appear reasonably calculated to lead to the discovery of admissible evidence. Any responsive documents shall be produced in accordance with the terms and conditions outlined in the stipulated protective order previously entered by the court on 11/22/2013 17 . (Reader, L)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/22/2013. (Michel, G)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory et al v. City of Vallejo, CA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Gregory
Represented By: Nicholas Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loren Mollner
Represented By: Nicholas Casper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Vallejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Nichelini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Kreins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?