Scott-George v. PVH Corporation
Plaintiff: Jodi Scott-George
Defendant: PVH Corporation
Case Number: 2:2013cv00441
Filed: March 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Nevada
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER GRANTING Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Motion for Award of Class Representative Service Payments, Settlement Administration Expenses and Attorneys' Fees and Costs signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/27/17. (Kaminski, H)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/13/2017 STIPULATED Protective Order APPROVED.(Reader, L)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 [DISREGARD FILED IN ERROR]ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/6/2016 ORDERING The undersigned DECLINES to rule on the admissibility of the deposition, as that matter is properly before the District Court.(Reader, L) Modified on 10/6/2016 (Reader, L).
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/15/16 ORDERING that the deadline to file the Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval is EXTENDED to 9/30/2016. The hearing date for the Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval is CONTINUED to 11/3/2016 at 2:00 p.m. (Kastilahn, A)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/31/2016 ORDERING that parties are to file the Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement on or before 9/16/2016. The hearing for this motion will be on 10/20/16 at 2:00 p.m. (Jackson, T)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER denying 121 Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/27/16. (Kaminski, H)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/21/2016 ORDERING that defendant's 114 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Furthermore, the Court finds that Plaintiffs have not met their burden of showing t hat PVH and Retail Stores meet the "integrated enterprise" test required to pierce the corporate veil between the two companies. Thus, because Retail Stores is not named as a defendant in this lawsuit, the Subclasses of this lawsuit must be restricted to nonexempt employees of PVH. (Zignago, K.)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/19/15 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (ECF No. 55 ) is GRANTED. Defendant's Motion to Strike the Declaration of Dakkar Hunter (ECF No. 69 ) is GRANTED; and Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Defendant's Exhibits 1124, 26, 27, 2932, and 44 (ECF No. 83 ) is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/12/2015 GRANTING defendant's 101 Ex Parte Application for extension of time. PVH Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due 28 days following Court's Order on Class Certi fication. Plaintiffs' Opposition will be due 14 days after defendant's Motion. Defendant's Reply is due 14 days after plaintiffs' Opposition. Hearing shall be set for first available date following due date of Reply unless hearing date is less than 7 days after Reply is due. In which case, hearing should be set for second available date after Reply is due. (Marciel, M)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/18/15 ORDERING that Exhibit A, and Exhibit L, in support of Defendant PVH Corp's 90 Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude, shall remain SEALED until such time as either PVH or the individuals whose privacy interests would be affected disclose publicly the document or information therein. (Kastilahn, A)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/4/2015 ORDERING 83 The Court, having considered the Plaintiffs' Amended Request for Seal Documents submitted pursuant to Civil L.R. 141, the following documents (which are exhibits to the Decl aration of Ronald H. Bae in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Exclude Defendant's Exhibits 1124, 26, 27, 29 -32 and 44 to Defendant's Compendium of Evidence Submitted in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification) are ACCEPTED for filing under seal, subject to the provisions of Amended Stipulated Protective Order entered on 8/12/2013. 32 (Reader, L)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/23/2015 GRANTING plaintiffs' 75 Ex Parte Application. Jodi Scott-George and Melissa Wiggs may file a Reply Brief of up to 15 pages in support of their 55 Motion for Class Certification. (Marciel, M)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 71 SEALING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/18/15 ORDERING the Court, having considered Defendant PVH Corp.'s Request To Seal Certain Documents in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Class Certification and having found good cause, accepts the referenced documents under seal, pursuant to the Civil L.R. 141 and the Parties' Amended Stipulated Protective Order 32 . (Becknal, R)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 63 Ex Parte Application to Enlarge Page Limit signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/30/15: Defendant PVH Corporation may file a brief in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for class certification of up to 30 pages. (Kaminski, H)
December 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER RE: Plaintiff's Requst to Seal certain documents in support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/23/14. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/21/2014 ORDERING that the plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification be filed by 12/17/2014; ORDERING that the defendant's Opposition Brief be filed by 2/12/2015; ORDERING that the plaintiffs' Reply Brief be filed by 2/26/2015; CONTINUING the Motion Hearing on the plaintiffs' forthcoming Motion for Class Certification to 3/26/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Michel, G)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/31/14 47 RESETTING Motion for Class Certification Hearing to 1/29/2015 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Meuleman, A)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/26/14 ORDERING that tha deadline to File Plaintiffs' MOTION for Class Certification, is CONTINUED from 8/29/14 to 10/28/2014. The hearing date for Plaintiffs' MOTION for Class Certification is RESET for hearing on 1/15/2015 at 02:00 PM. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION and ORDER re: 43 signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/4/14 ORDERING the deadline for Plaintiffs to file their Motion for Class Certification continued from 2/27/14 to 8/28/14, to allow the parties to complete the mediation; and the hearing date reserved for Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification currently set for 4/24/14 at 2:00 p.m. is RESET for hearing on 10/23/14. (Meuleman, A)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re 38 signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/1/13. Plaintiff may file her Third Amended Complaint. The Third Amended Complaint will be deemed filed with this Court and served on Defendant on the date of this Order; and Defendant shall file a responsive pleading within 30 calendar days of the filing date of the Third Amended Complaint. (Meuleman, A)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/26/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff may file her Second Amended Complaint; The Second Amended Complaint will be deemed filed with this Court and served on Defendant on the date of this Order; and Defendant shall file a responsive pleading within 30 calendar days of the filing date of the Second Amended Complaint. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/9/13. (Kastilahn, A)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/30/2013 ORDERING 28 that the parties' request for entry of the proposed stipulated protective order is DENIED without prejudice. (Reader, L)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/13/13. Amended complaint is deemed filed on the date of this order. Responsive pleading due within 28 days. (Manzer, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott-George v. PVH Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Scott-George
Represented By: Ronald H. Bae
Represented By: Autumn E. Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PVH Corporation
Represented By: Asheley Dean
Represented By: Dean Hansell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?