Casperson v. The Golden 1 Credit Union, et al.
Plaintiff: Carl Casperson
Defendant: The Golden 1 Credit Union, Koraf Corporation, Douglas Knutsen and Phyllis Knutsen
Case Number: 2:2013cv00481
Filed: March 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/6/2014. This matter is REFERRED to District Judge John A. Mendez and all dates pending before Judge Newman are VACATED. (Marciel, M)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/25/2013 ORDERING that all dates set in the 15 Scheduling Order are VACATED. It is further ordered that the Parties appear, in person, at a Status Conference on 1/22/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 14 days prior to the conference. (Zignago, K.)
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/5/2013 ORDERING Plaintiff to file his First Amended Complaint within five (5) calendar days; ORDERING Defendants to file their response fourteen (14) days after the First Amended Complaint is filed. (Michel, G)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/16/13: Defendants Douglas Knutsen, Phyllis Knutsen, Koraf Corporation, and Golden 1 Credit Union shall have until May 10, 2013, to respond to the Complaint. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casperson v. The Golden 1 Credit Union, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Casperson
Represented By: Tanya E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Golden 1 Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koraf Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Knutsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis Knutsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?