Morris v. Green

Plaintiff: Leon E. Morris
Defendant: C. M. Green
Case Number: 2:2013cv00589
Filed: March 26, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2015 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 2/8/15 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 9/17/18 65 are ADOPTED in full; Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment 58 is GRANTED and DENIED in part as follows; A. Denied as to Plaintiff's claim that Defendant retaliated against him by not sending his legal mail in December 2011; and B. GRANTED as to any remaining claims. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 17, 2015 65 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/17/15 RECOMMENDING that defendants motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 58 ) be granted and denied in part as follows: Denied as to plaintiffs claim that defendant retaliated against him by not sending his legal mail in December 2011; and Granted as to any remaining claims. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
July 9, 2015 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/9/15 re: 53 Motion for Reconsideration: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, upon reconsideration, the Order of the Magistrate Judge filed 6/8/15 52 , is AFFIRMED. (Meuleman, A)
June 25, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/24/15 granting 55 Motion to Stay. The court shall stay the briefing on plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 54 pending its ruling on defendant's forthcoming motion for summary judgment for failure to exhaust administrative remedies. (Plummer, M)
June 8, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/8/2015 DENYING plaintiff's 50 motion for the appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
May 6, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/6/2015 DENYING plaintiff's 36 and 37 motions. (Yin, K)
March 27, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/27/15 denying 46 Motion for Summary Judgment to renewal after 06/12/15. (Plummer, M)
March 13, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 03/12/15 granting 38 Motion to Compel and extend discovery as follows: Within 21 days of the date of this order, defendant shall serve plaintiff with a notice of deposition. If plaintiff doe s not reasonably cooperate in his deposition on the scheduled date, the court will consider recommending dismissal of this action. Defendants' request for monetary sanctions is denied. The discovery and dispositive motion deadlines in the Discovery and Scheduling Order 35 are hereby vacated. The parties may conduct discovery until 06/12/15. All pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery, shall be filed on or before 9/19/15. (Plummer, M)
August 20, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/19/2014 DENYING defendant's 27 motion for an order revoking plaintiff's ifp status. (Yin, K)
December 3, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Leon E. Morris signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 12/03/13. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
May 14, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/14/13 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
April 29, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/26/13 ORDERING that upon reconsideration, the order of the magistrate judge filed 4/10/2013, is AFFIRMED. (Kastilahn, A)
April 10, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/10/2013 ORDERING that plaintiff's 4 motion for recusal is DENIED; and plaintiff's 5 motion to proceed IFP is DENIED for the reasons set forth in the 4/3/2013 court's order. (Yin, K)
April 3, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 04/03/13 ordering that plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, the $350.00 filing fee for this action. (Plummer, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon E. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. M. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?