Pacific Legal Foundation v. Salazar et al

Defendant: Ken Salazar, Daniel M. Ashe, United States Department of the Interior and United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Plaintiff: Pacific Legal Foundation
Case Number: 2:2013cv00594
Filed: March 27, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 12/19/2013 GRANTING 17 Motion and ORDERS that the revised deadlines for submitting the findings to the Federal Register shall be as follows: Eureka Valley Dunegrass 2/21/2014; Eureka Valley evening primrose 2/21/2014; and Tidewater goby 3/7/2014. (Donati, J)
August 5, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/2/13. (Dillon, M)
June 19, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/18/13 ORDERING that a further Status Conference is set for 8/5/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. If the case is not settled by the 8/5/13 conference the court will direct that a summary judgment motion be filed. (Manzer, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Legal Foundation v. Salazar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel M. Ashe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Legal Foundation
Represented By: Anthony L. Francois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?