Robinson v. Lewis
Petitioner: Julius M. Robinson
Respondent: G. W. Lewis
Case Number: 2:2013cv00604
Filed: March 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/9/2020 RECOMMENDING 13 Motion to Dismiss be denied; Claim 6 of 1 Petition be deemed voluntarily dismissed; and this case proceed on the 5 remaining exhausted claims. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 09/21/20 ORDERING that Assistant Federal Defenders David Harshaw and Carolyn M. Wiggin are appointed to represent petitioner. (Plummer, M)
November 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying 30 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/19/13. (Plummer, M)
November 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/1/2013 RECOMMENDING that respondent's 13 motion to dismiss be granted and that petitioner's 18 motion to proceed as legal representative be denied. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections due within 21 days. (Yin, K)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Extension of time signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/17/13: Petitioner may file a reply to respondent's opposition to petitioner's next friend motion within thirty days of the date of this order. (Kaminski, H)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/19/2013 GRANTING petitioner's 10 motion to proceed IFP. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Julius M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: G. W. Lewis
Represented By: Brian George Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?