United States of America v. Approximately $42,000.00 in U.S. Currency, et al.

Defendant: Approximately $18,000.00 in U.S.Currency and Approximately $42,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Enrique Espinoza Leon and Mark Anthony Brown
Plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2013cv00764
Filed: April 19, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 20, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT of FORFEITURE signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/20/2014. CASE CLOSED. (Donati, J)
September 24, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/23/13: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 7/20/2014. Discovery due by 9/1/2014. Dispositive Motions filed by 10/10/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2014 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Jury Trial set for 2/23/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Kaminski, H)
April 22, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PUBLICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/22/2013. (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $42,000.00 in U.S. Currency, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $18,000.00 in U.S.Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $42,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Enrique Espinoza Leon
Represented By: Edward Michael Burch
Represented By: David Martin Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Mark Anthony Brown
Represented By: David Martin Michael
Represented By: Edward Michael Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?