Tat Tohumculuk A.S. v. H. J. Heinz Company, et al
Plaintiff: Tat Tohumculuk A.S
Defendant: H.J Heinz Company and Heinzseed
Case Number: 2:2013cv00773
Filed: April 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE 62 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/20/2015. Civil Case Terminated. CASE CLOSED. (Kirksey Smith, K)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/10/2014 ORDERING the defendants to provide the plaintiff with responses to interrogatory numbers 18, 19, 20, and 23 as soon as it is practicable to do so; ORDERING counsel for all parties to me et and confer regarding how they wish to proceed with addressing the questions posed by interrogatory numbers 33 and 34; ORDERING counsel for all parties to meet and confer regarding their issues concerning the plaintiff's requests for productio n of documents; ORDERING Defendants' counsel to provide Plaintiff's counsel by 11/10/2014 at 12:00 PM; the letter responding to the plaintiff's document requests that was referred to by the defendants' counsel; SETTING a further informal telephonic conference for 11/18/2014 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Michel, G)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/1/14: Non-Expert Discovery Closes December 31, 2014. Last Day to Disclose Experts and Produce Expert Reports is January 31, 2015. Last Day to Disclose Rebuttal Experts and Produce Expert Rebuttal Reports is February 15, 2015. Expert Discovery Closes March 1, 2015. (Kaminski, H)
July 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/18/14 ORDERING that the deadlines for discovery and motions set forth in the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order, are rescheduled as follows: Non-Expert Discovery Closes: Novembe r 14, 2014; Last Day to Disclose Experts and Produce Expert Reports: December 15, 2014; Last Day to Disclose Rebuttal Experts and Produce Expert Rebuttal Reports: January 15, 2015; Expert Discovery Closes: February 13, 2015; Last Day to File Motions, Except for Continuances, Temporary Restraining Orders, or Other Emergency Applications: February 13, 2015. (Becknal, R)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/6/2014. (Zignago, K.)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/18/2014 ORDERING that Plaintiff is allowed to file its Third Amended Complaint. Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint will stand as Defendants' answer to Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint. (Zignago, K.) (Main Document 43 replaced on 2/19/2014) (Zignago, K.).
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/22/2013 CONTINUING the deadline for Defendants to file a responsive pleading to the Second Amended Complaint to 1/3/2014; CONTINUING the Initial Scheduling Conference to 1/6/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Michel, G)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/14/2013 re 24 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss: Defendants' motion to dismiss is hereby DENIED with respect to plaintiff's breach of contract and breach of implied covenant claims, and GRANTED in all other respects. Plaintiff has twenty days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint, if it can cure the defects in its claims consistent with this Order. (Kirksey Smith, K)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 THIRD STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/6/13 ORDERING the Initial Scheduling Conference RESET for 12/23/13 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 12/9/13. (Becknal, R)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER 21 for leave to file Amended Complaint and withdraw Motion signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/10/2013. Defendants' 12 Motion to Dismiss is WITHDRAWN and Hearing is VACATED. The last day for plaintiff to file F irst Amended Complaint is 7/29/2013. Defendants' Answer or Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint is due 8/26/2013. Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to filed by 9/23/2013. Defendants' Reply to Opposition shall be be submitted by 10/ 7/2013. Hearing on Motion to Dismiss will be scheduled for 10/21/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS). Initial Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to 11/25/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS). Joint Status Report to be filed no later than 11/12/2013. (Marciel, M)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/27/2013 ORDERING Initial Scheduling Conference RESET for 9/30/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; a joint status report shall be filed no later than 9/16/2013. (Waggoner, D)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER 17 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/7/2013 RESETTING MOTION HEARING on 12 Defendants' MOTION to DISMISS for 8/12/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. Plaintiff's opposition to the Motion will be due on or before July 22, 2013. Defendants' reply to Plaintiff's opposition to the Motion will be due on or before August 2, 2013. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tat Tohumculuk A.S. v. H. J. Heinz Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tat Tohumculuk A.S
Represented By: Effie F. Anastassiou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.J Heinz Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heinzseed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?