Sanchez v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Dannie Sanchez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2013cv00786
Filed: April 22, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/1/13. The Court ADOPTS the parties' stipulation. Plaintiff's opening brief is now due on 10/25/13. The Court's 6 Scheduling Order is MODIFIED accordingly. (Meuleman, A)
October 29, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/29/2013 ORDERING 14 that Plaintiff's opening brief is now due on 11/8/2013. The Court's Scheduling Order 6 is modified accordingly. (Reader, L)
December 12, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER extending time to file either a Stipulation to Remand or Opposition to Plaintiff Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/12/13. (Kaminski, H)
September 19, 2014 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/19/2014 GRANTING IN PART 16 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING 19 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; REMANDING this action for further proceedings consistent with this order pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G)
December 29, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/29/2014 ORDERING that an award of attorneys fees in the amount of $6,000.00, and expenses and costs in the amount of $425.54, for a total of $6,425.54, shall be awarded to Plaintiff as a settlement amount. (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dannie Sanchez
Represented By: Kelsey Mackenzie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Paul Sachelari, GOVT
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.