Pinder v. Employment Development Department, et al

Plaintiff: Frank Pinder
Defendant: Employment Development Department, Richard Rogers and David Derks
Case Number: 2:2013cv00817
Filed: April 25, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 26, 2015 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/24/15 GRANTING 54 Ex Parte Application, filed by David Derks, Employment Development Department, Richard Rogers. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' reply brief to the motion for summary judgment shall be filed by no later than 10/1/15; the hearing on 50 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT shall be heard in Courtroom 2 on 10/8/15 at 2:00 p.m. (Meuleman, A)
July 29, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/28/2015 GRANTING defendants' 48 Ex Parte Application. Defendants may file an Opening Brief to their Dispositive Motion not to exceed 25 pages, and may file a Reply Brief not to exceed 15 pages. (Marciel, M)
August 14, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/12/14 ORDERING the 6/13/14 motion of Lawrance Bohm, Esq. and Erik Roper, Esq. to withdraw as counsel for plaintiff 22 is granted; Plaintiff Frank Pinder shall proceed in propria persona and the C lerk is directed to change the record in this action accordingly and to include Mr. Pinder's address as set forth on 28 on the service list in this action; Plaintiff's 6/13/14 motion to continue the trial and modify dates set in the scheduling order 23 is granted; In view of plaintiff's pro se status, this matter is referred to the assigned magistrate judge for all further pretrial proceedings, including issuance of a modified scheduling order as requested in the 6/13/14 motion to continue trial and modify dates. (Becknal, R)
August 6, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/6/2014 ORDERING that counsel are granted five days from the date of this order in which to file the additional declaration required by the 26 Order of July 21, 2014. (Waggoner, D)
July 21, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/21/14: Counsel shall file the affidavit or declaration required by this order no later than July 30, 2014 at 4:30 p.m. Counsel shall also file a declaration in the public record establishing compl iance with Cal. Prof. Conduct Rule 3-700(D) (regarding client files and retainer agreement funds) and the representations in counsel's affidavit concerning waiver of expenses and recovery of attorney fees, or what steps they have taken to comply. (Kaminski, H)
August 20, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/19/2013 ORDERING that Defendants' 9 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinder v. Employment Development Department, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Pinder
Represented By: Lawrance A. Bohm
Represented By: Bradley J. Mancuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employment Development Department
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Rogers
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Derks
Represented By: Mark John Tamblyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?