Parthemore v. Kissel, et al

Plaintiff: Ira Don Parthemore
Defendant: B Kissel, J. Soltanian, L Reaves, C-Facility Captain and Blackwell
Case Number: 2:2013cv00819
Filed: April 26, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2015 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 67 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 08/26/15. (Plummer, M)
July 28, 2015 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/28/2015 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 61 motion for sanctions is DENIED. Defendants' 62 request to strike plaintiff's motion for sanctions is GRANTED and the 61 motion for sancti ons shall be STRICKEN from the record. Defendants' 62 request to sanction plaintiff is DENIED. Plaintiff's 64 motion to stay his deadline to respond to defendants' requests for production is GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiff's resp onses to defendants' requests for production will be due twenty-one days after plaintiff has an opportunity to review both his central file and medical records and obtain the necessary copies from each.The Attorney General's Office and Dep uty Attorney General Sylvie Snyder shall ensure that plaintiff is provided an opportunity to review his central file and medical records and make copies of any documents therein that are necessary to replace his missing documents. They shall also take whatever steps are necessary to verify that plaintiff's property has not simply been misplaced. As a one-time courtesy, the Clerk of the Court is directed to provide plaintiff with a copy of his 21 first amended complaint. (Zignago, K.)
May 5, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/04/15 ordering the Custodian to produce Ira Don Parthemore on 06/02/15 at 1:30 p.m. in courtroom 27 before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD & DAD)(Plummer, M)
April 3, 2015 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/2/2015 DEEMING 51 Objections to Findings and Recommendations filed on 3/24/2015; CONFIRMING 50 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations. (Michel, G.)
March 31, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/30/15 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 3/6/15 49 , are ADOPTED in full. Defendants' MOTION for Summary Judgment 42 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Defendants' MOTION to DISMISS 43 is DENIED. Defendants Soltanian, Smith, and Heatley are ordered to answer the remaining claims within thirty days from the date of this order.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 6, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/5/2015 RECOMMENDING that defendants' 42 motion for summary judgment be granted in part and denied in part, (a) granted as to all claims against defendants Kissel, Th omas, Costa, Sherrard, Heintschel, Reaves, Toor, Malakkla, Virk, and Neal and these defendants be dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies, (b) granted as to the claim that defendant Soltanian refused to issue a me dical hold and the claim be dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies, (c) denied as to the claim that defendant Soltanian refused to order shoulder surgery, (d) denied as to defendants Smith and Heatley; defendants&# 039; 43 motion to dismiss be denied; and defendants Soltanian, Smith, and Heatly be ordered to answer the remaining claims within 30 days from the date of adoption of the instant findings and recommendations. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due within 14 days. No extensions of time wil be granted.(Yin, K)
April 23, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/22/14 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 3/25/14 35 are ADOPTED in full; and Plaintiff's MOTION for immediate Injunctive Relief 34 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 16, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/15/2014 VACATING defendants' 33 motion to dismiss; defendants may, within 14 days, bring a motion for summary judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 on the issue of administrative exhau stion, in doing so, defendants must provide plaintiff with a notice required under Rand v. Rowland; defendants may, within 14 days, re-file that portion of the vacated motion brought pursuant to Rule 12(b) (6) in a separate motion or in combination with any motion for summary judgment regarding the exhaustion of administrative remedies. (Yin, K)
March 25, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/25/14 recommending that plaintiff's motion for immediate injunctive relief 34 be denied. MOTION for immediate injunctive relief 34 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
November 21, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/20/2013 ORDERING that defendant Blackwell is DISMISSED with leave to amend within 30 days, plaintiff is not obligated to amend his complaint; service is appropriate for defendants B. Kissel, J. So ltanian, C. Thomas, K. Costa, J. Sherrard, C. Heintschel, L. Reaves, Smith; S. Heatley, K. Toor, K. Malakka, P. Virk, and T. Neal; the Clerk shall provide plaintiff with forms for service which plaintiff may complete and return within 30 days; plaintiff shall return the Notice of Submission or Amendment with response.(Yin, K)
May 29, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/29/13 ORDERING that 5 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED; 11 Motion for authorization is GRANTED; Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within thirty days from the date of this order.(Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parthemore v. Kissel, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira Don Parthemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Kissel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Soltanian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L Reaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C-Facility Captain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?