Hammersley et al v. General Electric Company, et al

Plaintiff: Carson Hammersley and Amy Hammersley
Defendant: General Electric Company, GE Healthcare, Inc. and GE Healthcare AS
Case Number: 2:2013cv00826
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Butte
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2016 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 01/26/16 ORDERING that the 142 Joint Request to Seal Document(s) filed by Amy Hammersley is GRANTED. (Benson, A)
December 15, 2015 139 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE PARTIES signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/15/15. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 4, 2015 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/4/15 ORDERING that Grace Lynn Leach is APPOINTED as Guardian Ad Litem for Plaintiff A. H. in this matter. (Kastilahn, A)
November 16, 2015 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/13/2015 ORDERING that redacted copies of Exhibits 14, 17, 18, 20, 24, 36, 37 and 38 to the 117 Declaration of David Krugler shall be substituted for the original Exhibits currently on file. Unred acted copies of these Exhibits shall be filed under seal. A newly redacted version of Plaintiff's Statements of Disputed Fact shall be substituted for Doc. No. 119 . An unredacted copy of Plaintiff's Statements of Disputed Fact shall be f iled under seal. A newly redacted version of Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment shall be substituted for Doc. No. 120 . An unredacted copy of Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Def endants Motion for Summary Judgment shall be filed under seal. The following paragraphs of Plaintiffs Response to Defendants' Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment shall be redacted: 11, 23, 29, 30, 31, 32, 33, 34-37 and 40. An unredacted version of this pleading be filed under seal. (Zignago, K.)
November 4, 2015 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/3/15 ORDERING the following documents shall be filed under seal, and shall be maintained under seal until introduced at trial, unless otherwise ordered by this Court: Exhibits A, B, C, D, E, F, and H to the Declaration of John W. Elder with associated sections of GEHC's SUMF Response as identified in GEHC's Seal Request. (Becknal, R)
October 28, 2015 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/27/2015 GRANTING the plaintiff's Request to Seal Documents in opposition to 108 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Michel, G.)
October 16, 2015 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/15/15 ORDERING that, pursuant to 112 Notice of Request to Seal Document(s), The following documents shall be filed UNDER SEAL, and shall be maintained under seal until introduced at trial, u nless otherwise ordered by this Court: (1) Exhibits L and N of the Declaration of John W. Elder, together with associated sections of Defendants' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of their Motion for Summary Judgment (pages 5:6-17, and 17:19-28, as well as Undisputed Fact Nos. 35-37); and (2) Exhibits A-O (excluding C, H, & N) to the Declaration of Fred E. Longenecker. (Benson, A)
March 12, 2015 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/11/2015 ORDERING 94 Disclosure of Expert Witnesses due by 7/1/2015, Defendant's disclosure of new rebuttal experts and supplemental reports by 7/31/2015/ Expert Discovery due by 9/1/2015; Dis positive Motions filed by 11/5/2015; Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statements by 1/7/2016; Final Pretrial Conference Reset for 1/14/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley; Trial Brief shall be filed not later than 14 days before trial; Trial Reset for 3/7/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Reader, L)
March 5, 2015 95 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/5/15 ORDERING that the hearing on 91 MOTION to Exclude All Evidence Supplied by Dr. Shawn Cowper Due to Plaintiffs' Failure to Properly Disclose Him as Their Retained Litigation Expert Witness is removed from the Court's docket. (Meuleman, A)
February 20, 2015 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/19/2015 ORDERING Defendants' Motion to Exclude 91 Hearing is CONTINUED to 3/11/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire; Plaintiff shall file a response to the motion to exclude no later than 3/4/2015, at 4:30 PM. Failure to respond timely, or to timely request a further extension of time, will result in the motion being granted as un-opposed. (Becknal, R)
July 30, 2014 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/30/14 ORDERING that the Scheduling Order 66 is amended as follows: all fact discovery shall be completed by 9/30/14; All expert disclosures shall be filed and served by 11/1/2014; all dispositive motions, shall be heard by 4/9/2015. All other deadlines established in the Scheduling Order, including the trial date, remain intact. (Kastilahn, A)
May 20, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/20/14 ORDERING that the Clerk of Court refer this case to another available United States Magistrate Judge for any further proceedings which may be appropriate or required. (Becknal, R)
March 10, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/7/14 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' OBJECTIONS 67 , 71 to the Pretrial Scheduling Order are OVERRULED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammersley et al v. General Electric Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carson Hammersley
Represented By: Alwyn R. Fredericks, PHV
Represented By: David Najeeb Krugler, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Hammersley
Represented By: Alwyn R. Fredericks, PHV
Represented By: David Najeeb Krugler, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Matthew J. Evans, PHV
Represented By: Matthew G. Jacobs
Represented By: Heidi L. Levine, PHV
Represented By: Leeanne Sara Neri
Represented By: Dwight E. Tarwater, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Evans, PHV
Represented By: Matthew G. Jacobs
Represented By: Heidi L. Levine, PHV
Represented By: Leeanne Sara Neri
Represented By: Dwight E. Tarwater, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GE Healthcare AS
Represented By: Matthew G. Jacobs
Represented By: Heidi L. Levine, PHV
Represented By: Leeanne Sara Neri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?