Arias v. Raimondo
Plaintiff: Jose Arnulfo Arias
Defendant: Anthony Raimondo, Luis M. Angelo, Maria D. Angelo and Joe Angelo
Case Number: 2:2013cv00904
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/29/16 ORDERING the Court has reviewed the stipulation of the parties concerning the stay of execution and enforcement, without bond, of the order assessing costs that was entered by this Court on F ebruary 8, 2016, pending the resolution of the appeal that has been taken to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit from the Courts dismissal of the First Amended Complaint. Good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED that the stipulation of the parties as set forth in this document is the Order of this Court on the question of a stay of execution or enforcement of the judgment within the meaning of Rule 62 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Becknal, R)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/8/2016. Court has reviewed totality of circumstances and finds "the reasons for denying costs are not sufficiently persuasive to overcome the presumption in favor of an award." Plaintiff's 60 Objections are SUSTAINED in part. The 59 Costs Submitted to defendant are GRANTED in amount of $14,498.04. (Marciel, M)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/15/2015 ORDERING that Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is DISMISSED in its entirety. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/27/2015 GRANTING defendant Anthony Raimondo's 35 Motion to Dismiss. Court finds plaintiff's FLSA claim remains deficient since plaintiff has failed to demonstrate defendant is an employer pursuant to controlling precedent. Plaintiff has 14 days to amend his Complaint with respect to this claim only. (Marciel, M)
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/5/2014 ORDERING Defendant's 35 Motion to Dismiss and 36 SPECIAL ANTI-SLAPP MOTION to STRIKE are CONTINUED to 9/25/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley, and that all briefing dates be calendared according to the new hearing date. (Waggoner, D) Modified on 8/5/2014 (Krueger, M).
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/25/14 GRANTING 11 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to amend within 14 days. (Manzer, C)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/13/2013 ORDERING that all parties will exchange initial disclosures under Rule 26(a) no later than 9/20/2013. (Donati, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arias v. Raimondo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Raimondo
Represented By: Stephen T Clifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis M. Angelo
Represented By: Benjamin L. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria D. Angelo
Represented By: Benjamin L. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Angelo
Represented By: Benjamin L. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Arnulfo Arias
Represented By: Blanca A. Banuelos
Represented By: Marsha Jade Chien
Represented By: Felicia Arlene Espinosa
Represented By: Christopher V. Ho
Represented By: Araceli Martinez-Olguin
Represented By: Michael Meuter
Represented By: Daniel Peralta Torres
Represented By: Esmeralda Crystal Zendejas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?