Versata Software, Inc. et al v. Dorado Software, Inc.
Plaintiff: Versata Software, Inc. and Versata Development Group, Inc.
Defendant: Dorado Software, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv00920
Filed: May 9, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and ORDER 38 signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 9/2/15 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 JOINT MOTION AND ORDER TO STAY signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/17/15. Motion to Stay 35 is GRANTED; This case is STAYED for thirty days. In addition, not later than thirty (30) days following the date this order is electronically filed, the parties are ordered to file either a Joint Status Report or dispositional documents with the Court. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 4/6/15 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant with respect to U.S. Patent No. 6,907,414 are DISMISSED without prejudice. The parties shall bear their own costs, expenses, and attorneys' fees with regard to those claims. This case shall proceed on Plaintiffs' remaining claims. (Kastilahn, A)
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/10/2015 GRANTING 27 Motion to Modify the 21 Pretrial Scheduling Order; ORDERING that all discovery, with the exception of expert discovery, be completed by 2/22/2016; ORDERING that a ll experts be disclosed by 3/28/2016; ORDERING that all dispositive motions be filed by 6/27/2016; ORDERING that the Joint Pretrial Conference Statement and all evidentiary and procedural motions be filed by 10/3/2016; ORDERING t hat trial briefs and oppositions to evidentiary and procedural motions be filed by 10/10/2016; ORDERING that any reply to evidentiary and procedural motions be filed by 10/17/2016; SETTING the Final Pretrial Conference for 10/20/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; SETTING the Jury Trial for 12/5/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. See Order for more details. (Michel, G.)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AMENDED ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/5/2015 SUPERSEDING 25 Order granting 22 Motion to Modify the 21 Pretrial Scheduling Order; ORDERING that all discovery, with the exception of expert discovery be completed by 11/23/2015; ORDERING that the disclosure of expert witnesses be completed by 12/21/2015. (Michel, G)
December 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/2/2014 GRANTING 22 Motion to Modify the 21 Pretrial Scheduling Order; VACATING all dates set in the 21 Pretrial Scheduling Order; INFORMING all parties that an amended shceduling order will follow. (Michel, G)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/25/14. (Manzer, C)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/30/2014 LIFTING the stay in this matter; ORDERING that a Joint Status Report be filed within twenty (20) days. (Michel, G)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/27/2014 ORDERING that Defendant's 9 Motion to Stay is GRANTED, and this matter is STAYED. Plaintiffs and Defendant are directed to file a Joint Status Report within ten (10) days of the latter of either the issuance of a decision by the Supreme Court in Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd. v. CLS Bank International, et. al. (Case No. 13-298) or the issuance of a decision in the Volusion, Inc. v. Versata Software, Inc. et. al. (Case CBM2013-00017) PTAB proceeding. However, if the stay has not already been lifted, not later than 4:00 p.m. on Thursday, 10/30/2014, the parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report advising the Court of the status of the proceedings before the PTAB and the status of the Supreme Court proceedings in Alice Corporation Pty. Ltd. v. CLS Bank International, et. al. (Case No. 13-298). (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Versata Software, Inc. et al v. Dorado Software, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Versata Software, Inc.
Represented By: Alisa A. Lipski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Versata Development Group, Inc.
Represented By: Alisa A. Lipski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorado Software, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?