McLaughlin v. Spearman
Petitioner: Richard Michael McLaughlin
Respondent: M. Spearman
Case Number: 2:2013cv00924
Filed: May 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AMENDED FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 03/16/15 recommending that petitioner's motion to file a response to respondent's reply 13 be granted; and respondent's motion to dismiss 10 be granted. Motions 10 and 13 referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
November 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/05/14 ordering the custodian to produce Richard M. McLaughlin on 12/17/14 at 1:30 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison via video conf erence. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: I.T. Dept, Sacramento)(Plummer, M) Modified on 11/6/2014 (Plummer, M).
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 09/30/14 granting 16 Motion for an evidentiary hearing. An evidentiary hearing as to petitioner's claim for equitable tolling is set for 12/17/14 at 1:30 p.m. before the undersigned in Redding, California.The 08/18/14 findings and recommendations 15 are vacated. (Plummer, M)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/15/2014 RECOMMENDING that petitioner's 13 motion to file a response to respondent's reply be granted; and respondent's 10 motion to dismiss be granted. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections due within 14 days.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLaughlin v. Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Michael McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: M. Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?