Conservation Congress et al v. U.S. Forest Service et al
Plaintiff: Conservation Congress and Citizens for Better Forestry
Defendant: U.S. Forest Service and U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Case Number: 2:2013cv00934
Filed: May 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538 Endangered Species Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/16/2020 Regarding deadlines related to 79 Motion to Strike. Federal Defendants' opposition to the Motion to Strike due on or before 11/24/2020. Plaintiffs' Reply in support of the Motion to Strike due on or before 12/4/2020. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/10/2020 ORDERING Federal Defendants to file an Opposition to the Second Motion to Supplement by 10/9/2020; ORDERING Defendant-Intervenor to file an Opposition to the Second Motion to Supplement by 10/23/2020; and ORDERING Plaintiffs to file a Reply in support of the Second Motion to Supplement by 11/6/2020. (Michel, G.)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/8/2020 GRANTING the Parties' Stipulated Request to Dispense with the Statement of Undisputed Facts.(Becknal, R)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/11/2020 ORDERING Plaintiffs shall file a motion for summary judgment by 9/4/2020; Federal Defendants shall file a cross motion for summary judgment by 10/9/2020; Defendant-Intervenor shall file a cross motion for summary judgment by 10/23/2020; Plaintiffs shall file their combined reply in support of their motion for summary judgment and response to Federal Defendants' cross motion for summary judgment by 11/6/2020; Plainti ffs shall file their combined reply in support of their motion for summary judgment and response to Defendant-Intervenor's cross motion for summary judgment by 11/20/2020; Federal Defendants shall file their reply in support of their cross motion for summary judgment by 11/24/2020; Defendant-Intervenor shall file its reply in support of its cross motion for summary judgment by 12/7/2020. (Zignago, K.)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/27/2020 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 38 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record. (Kastilahn, A)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION and ORDER of Joint Briefing Schedule signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/6/2020. (Kastilahn, A)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION and ORDER TO LIFT STAY signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/8/19. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint within 84 days of the Court's Order lifting the stay. Federal Defendants shall respond to the amended complaint wi thin 42 days of Plaintiffs filing of the amended complaint. Federal Defendants shall lodge the administrative records within 28 days of responding to the amended complaint. The parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule to address any motions related to the administrative record and cross motions for summary judgment within 21 days of the lodging of the administrative record.Dated: July
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/8/13 ORDERING that upon entry of the Courts Order approving this Stipulation, the instant litigation will be stayed to allow for the USFS and FWS to complete the reinitiated ESA Section 7 consultation process and any attendant administrative processes otherwise required by law. Within 7 business days of its issuance, Federal Defendants will provide counsel for Plaintiff with an electronic copy of the new Biological Opinion. The parties shall confer and within 30 days of the transmittal referenced in Paragraph 2 the parties shall file a joint status report with this Court advising it of the parties proposals for whether, and how, the litigation should proceed.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conservation Congress et al v. U.S. Forest Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conservation Congress
Represented By: Marianne G. Dugan, PHV
Represented By: James Jay Tutchton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citizens for Better Forestry
Represented By: James Jay Tutchton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Forest Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?