Holsey v. Knipp
Petitioner: Leroy Dale Holsey
Respondent: William Knipp
Case Number: 2:2013cv00962
Filed: May 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/10/14 ORDERING that within 14 days of the filed date of this Findings and Recommendations/Order, petitioner indicate whether he desires counsel to be appointed f or the purpose of presenting and arguing objections; IT is RECOMMENDED that Petitioners application for a writ of habeas corpus be denied; and the District Court issue a certificate of appealability on the two issues referenced above. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 02/18/14 ordering respondent's request for a sealing order is granted as set forth in respondent's request filed 02/07/14 28 , with respect to the clerk's transcript (lodged document no. 1) and the augmented clerk's transcript (lodged document no. 2). (Plummer, M)
October 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/11/2013 ORDERING petitioner to file a second amended petition that is complete in and of itself within 30 days; respondent must file an answer or dispositive motion within 30 days thereafter. (See Order for Details) (Yin, K)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 08/05/13 ordering that Benjamin P. Ramos, Attorney at Law, shall be substituted in as appointed counsel for petitioner in place of the Office of the Federal Defender for the Eastern District of California. (Plummer, M)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/15/13 ORDERING that 6 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS are VACATED; The Federal Defender is appointed to represent petitioner; The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of the petit ion and this order on David Porter, Assistant Federal Defender. Within thirty days of this order, the parties shall file a joint scheduling statement. Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this order, the consent/reassignment form contemplated by Appendix A(k) to the Local Rules of this court together with a copy of the petition for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 on Michael Patrick Farrell, Senior Assistant Attorney General. (cc Michael Farrell)(Dillon, M)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 06/17/13 ORDERING petitioner is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk of the court shall randomly assign a United States District Judge to this a ction. U.S. District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller randomly assigned to this action. The clerk of the court shall serve a copy of these findings and recommendations together with a copy of the petition firled in the instant case on the Attorney General of the State of California. Also, RECOMMENDING that petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus be dismissed for failure to exhaust state remedies. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (cc: Michael Farrell, Attorney General) (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holsey v. Knipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Knipp
Represented By: Rachelle Anne Newcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Leroy Dale Holsey
Represented By: Benjamin P. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?