In Re: Estrella and James Kincaid
Appellant: Estrella A Kincaid and James M. Kincaid
Trustee: Susan K. Smith and Office of the U.S. Trustee (Sac)
Case Number: 2:2013cv01032
Filed: May 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334 Bankruptcy Appeal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/13/2015 GRANTING appellants' 41 Request for consideration of Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Furthermore, Clerk directed to provide a copy of this Order to United States Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals to assist in resolution of In re: Estrella Kincaid, et al v. Susan Smith, et al, Case No. 15-15761. [cc: USCA - 9th Circuit; Bankruptcy Clerk - Sacramento; Bankruptcy Judge Thomas Holman] (Marciel, M)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER for DISMISSAL of case signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/26/2015. Court is DISMISSING and CLOSING this action for appellants' failure to prosecute and failure to adhere to Court's rules. (Marciel, M)
January 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/6/2015 DENYING the 23 Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Reconsideration. (Michel, G)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying 20 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of time signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/3/14. (Kaminski, H)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/25/14 GRANTING 11 Motion to Vacate 10 Judgment. Debtors' designation of record and statement of issues are deemed timely filed. Debtors have 21 days to perfect any other deficiencies in their appeal. After the record is complete, the clerk of the bankruptcy court shall send a Certificate of Record to the clerk of the district court. Upon receipt the court shall issue a briefing schedule. (Manzer, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Estrella and James Kincaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Estrella A Kincaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: James M. Kincaid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Susan K. Smith
Represented By: J. Russell Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the U.S. Trustee (Sac)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?