Saling v. Royal, et al
Plaintiff: Tammy Saling
Defendant: Keith Royal, Gayle Satchwell and Human Resource, Nevada County
Case Number: 2:2013cv01039
Filed: May 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Nevada
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 123 AMENDED STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/31/2018 DISMISSING this action, with prejudice, pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); ORDERING each party to bear its own costs, attorney's fees, and expenses. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G.)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/31/2018 DISMISSING this action, with prejudice, pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); ORDERING each party to bear its own costs, attorney's fees, and expenses. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G.)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER RE SETTLEMENT AND DISPOSITION signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/29/18. The court now ORDERS that dispositional documents are to be filed not later than 10/31/2018. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/19/2018 ORDERING Settlement Conference set for 8/28/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Zignago, K.)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/9/2018 ORDERING the 105 Pre-Trial Scheduling order is modified as follows: Discovery deadline is EXTENDED to 10/31/2018; Designation of Expert Witnesses deadline is EXTENDED to 12/15/2018. (Washington, S)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 04/16/18. (Benson, A.)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 09/08/17 GRANTING 96 Motion to Dismiss as follows: Defendants Motion to Dismiss Claim five (threat of termination) is GRANTED without leave to amend; Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Claims three and four (disclosure of interviews and inquiry into personal relationship) is GRANTED without leave to amend. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report within 30 days regarding the remaining three claims.(Benson, A.)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/6/16: DENYING 82 Motion to Dismiss as to Claims one and two; GRANTING 82 Motion to Dismiss as to Claim five with leave to amend; GRANTING 82 Motion to Dismiss as to Claims three and four with leave to amend; DENYING 82 Motion to Dismiss as to Claim six; Defendant Royal's Motion for Qualified Immunity is DENIED. Plaintiff's leave to amend is limited to Claims three, four, and five. Plaintiff is not permitted to allege any new causes of action beyond those already alleged in the Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is granted thirty (30) days leave to amend from entry of this Order. (Washington, S)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/1/2015 ORDERING 86 Defendants have been and continue to be represented by County Counsel, Alison A. Barratt-Green; Attorneys Carl L. Fessenden and Ariana Van Alstine WITHDRAWN as attorney of record. (Reader, L)
October 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/19/15: The referral of this case to the magistrate judge is withdrawn and the case is referred back to the district judge. (Kaminski, H)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/29/2015 ORDERING that the 74 findings and recommendations are ADOPTED. Defendants' 40 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff is GRANTED thirty days from the date of service of this order to file a second amended complaint. (Zignago, K.)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/9/2015 RECOMMENDING that the 40 Motion to Dismiss be granted-in-part and denied-in-part. It is FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the plaintiff be granted 30 days from the date of the order adopting these findings and recommendations to file a second amended complaint. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Donati, J)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/11/15 GRANTING 59 Motion to Intervene. The EEOC's proposed amicus curiae brief (59-1) shall be filed as of the date of this order. Defendants may file a response on or before 5/27/15. Reply to response due on or before 6/10/15. (Manzer, C)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 50 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/3/15 RECOMMENDING that Defendants' 40 motion to dismiss plaintiff's first amended complaint be granted; Defendants' motion to dismiss plaintiff's due process claim be denied; and Plaintiff be granted 30 days from the date of service of any order adopting these findings and recommendation to file a second amended complaint. Matter referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations, any party may file written objections with the court and serve a copy on all parties. (Kastilahn, A)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/19/14 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION to Amend the Complaint 28 is GRANTED. Defendants' 7 MOTION to DISMISS is DENIED; Plaintiff shall file a First Amended Complaint by 6/2/2014. Defendants shall file a response to Plantiff's First Amended Complaint by 7/2/2014. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/24/2013 ORDERING that the hearing on defendant's motion to dismiss is CONTINUED to 8/28/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan; plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE, in writing, no later than 8/14/2013, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to timely file an opposition or a statement of non-opposition to the pending motion; defendants may file a reply to the opposition on or before 8/21/2013; th e 9/25/13 status (pretrial scheduling) conference is CONTINUED to 12/18/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan; on or before 12/4/2013 the parties shall file status reports in accordance with the 5/24/13 order. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saling v. Royal, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Saling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Royal
Represented By: Marcos Alfonso Kropf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gayle Satchwell
Represented By: Marcos Alfonso Kropf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Human Resource, Nevada County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?