Johnson et al v. The City of Vallejo et al
Plaintiff: Joseph L Johnson and Cynthia A Mitchell
Defendant: The City of Vallejo, Dustin B Joseph, Sean G Kenney and Joseph M Kreins
Case Number: 2:2013cv01072
Filed: May 30, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DISMISSAL signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/14/15 re: 112 . CASE CLOSED. (Meuleman, A) Modified on 8/17/2015 (Meuleman, A).
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/6/15 GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 63 , 64 , 65 , 66 Motions for Summary Judgment. (Meuleman, A)
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/14/15 GRANTING 67 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs Joseph Johnson and Cynthia Mitchell's Monell claim set forth in the fourth cause of action of their Complaint. (Meuleman, A)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/23/2015 DISMISSING with prejudice Doe defendants and second, tenth, and twelfth causes of action. (Donati, J)
January 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER TO SEAL DOCUMENTS [L.R. 141] signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/15/2015. (Michel, G)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/17/2014 GRANTING 62 Request to Seal Documents; SEALING Exhibits G, H, I, J, and K to the Declaration of Kristen K. Preston in support of 67 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Michel, G)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/5/14 ORDERING that the hearing on Plaintiff Cynthia Mitchell's MOTION to COMPEL 41 is VACATED. Plaintiff Cynthia Mitchell's MOTION to COMPEL is GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiffs' EX PARTE Application 51 is DENIED without prejudice in all aspects. The Discovery deadline is extended through 11/13/14. All other dates and deadlines shall remain in effect.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SECOND STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/31/14. (Kaminski, H)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/30/2014 ORDERING the Clerk to seal attachment #4 to 51 MOTION filed by Ahn Loc Harris. (Donati, J)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION and ORDER Regarding Data Recovery form Cellular Phones, signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/29/14. (Kastilahn, A)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/27/2014 ORDERING the hearing on the 33 MOTION for DISCOVERY CONTINUED to 10/30/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Counsel for Defendants sh all inform the court by 10/27/2014 whether defendants still wish to pursue all or part of their motion to compel. Within one week from the date of this order, the parties shall submit to the court a proposed stipulated protective order regarding the discovery of data. (Donati, J)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/22/14 GRANTING appointment of Cynquita Marin as guardian ad litem of Petitioners, D.M. and D.M. (Meuleman, A)
June 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/5/2014 ORDERING 24 The parties to this action hereby stipulate to the procedure set forth below for transferring biological samples of the deceased, Mario D.S.M. Romero, from the Solano Co unty Coroner's Office to a laboratory designated in this Order for the purpose of obtaining DNA information. All the parties stipulate to the foregoing and to the chain of custody identified in the Order. Written results of all DNA testing will be provided to all parties to this action. All fees for the referenced DNA testing, including delivery costs are to be paid by Bowles & Verna. (Reader, L)
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER re consent to be bound by ProtectiveOrder 13 signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/23/14. (Kaminski, H)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 2/24/14 ORDERING the related cases be consolidated pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 42 for all purposes, including trial. (Becknal, R)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/17/2014 ORDERING 14 Relating Case(s) 2:13-CV-1072 JAM KJN, 2:13-CV-2060 MCE DAD, REASSIGNING CASE 2:13-CV-2060 to Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman for all further proceedings, and any dates currently set in the reassigned case ONLY are hereby VACATED. Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr, Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd no longer assigned to case. New Case Number: 2:13-CV-2060 JAM KJN.(Reader, L)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/22/2013. (Michel, G)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. The City of Vallejo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph L Johnson
Represented By: Michael Patrick Verna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia A Mitchell
Represented By: Michael Patrick Verna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Vallejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin B Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean G Kenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Kreins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?