Richard Stafford v. Dollar Tree Stores Inc et al
Plaintiff: Richard Stafford
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. and Does
Case Number: 2:2013cv01187
Filed: June 14, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/18/2015 ORDERING 117 Request to Seal Document(s) filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. is DENIED. (Reader, L)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/13/15 GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 108 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's motion is denied insofar as it seeks to compel defendant to provide a further response, and as to Plaintiff& #039;s request for production number 68 and deposition topic number 5. Plaintiff's motion is granted with regard to its request for an order directing defendant to identify and provide an appropriate witness for continued deposition as to topics 1-4, 7-8 and 11. (Manzer, C)
August 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/12/2015 EXTENDING non-expert discovery to 9/15/2015, with respect to: (1) the conclusion of the defendant's 30(b)(6) deposition, limited to the completion of those topics for which C hristine Yu was designated as the defendant's witness, (2) the deposition of non-party witness Kenneth O'Neal, and (3) the deposition of non-party witness Christopher Bryant; ORDERING the defendant to produce documents responsive to the plaintiff's requests for production nos. 66, 67 and 68 by 9/15/2015. (Michel, G.)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER denying 109 EX PARTE APPLICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/3/15. (Kaminski, H)
April 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/31/15 GRANTING IN PART 89 Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint. Amended complaint due within 21 days. (Manzer, C)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/20/2014 GRANTING 72 Motion to Bifurcate. Plaintiff's individual Labor Code claims will be determined before the representative PAGA claims. This case is set for further Scheduling Conference on 12/11/2014 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Donati, J)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 75 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/29/2014 ORDERING that 2:14-cv-1465 / Richard Stafford v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. is REASSIGNED from Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. to the undersigned and from Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd to Magistrate Judge Carolyn A. Delaney. Clerk shall make the appropriate adjustment to the case assignment.(Waggoner, D)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 PROTECTIVE AND FRE 502(d) & (e) CLAWBACK ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/30/2014. (Michel, G)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/22/14: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 4/13/2015. Discovery due by 3/23/2015. Dispositive Motions filed by 4/24/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2015 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Trial set for 8/24/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Kaminski, H)
May 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/21/14 GRANTING 36 Stipulation to Strike Allegations in the 12 Second Amended Complaint. (Meuleman, A)
March 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying 46 Motion to Remand signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/27/14. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Stafford v. Dollar Tree Stores Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Stafford
Represented By: Graham S.P. Hollis
Represented By: Brian Richard Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Alison Jacquelyn Cubre
Represented By: Maureen E. McClain
Represented By: Constance E. Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?