Francisco, et al v. Citibank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Janeth Francisco and Arnel Francisco
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2013cv01195
Filed: June 13, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 (a) Fed. Question: Real Property
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/12/2013 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED without leave to amend; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 9/20/2013 GRANTING defendant's 11 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend. Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint no later than 30 days after date of Memorandum and Order is filed electronically. If no Amended Complaint is filed within said 30-day period, without notice, plaintiff's claims will dismissed without leave to amend. (Marciel, M)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/18/13 ORDERING the ex parte application is GRANTED; and The time for Citibank, N.A., as Trustee for Certificate Holders of Structured Asset Mortgage Investments II Trust 2007-AR5 to move, answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and includes 8/5/13. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francisco, et al v. Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janeth Francisco
Represented By: Linda Z Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnel Francisco
Represented By: Linda Z Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Steven Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?