Mohsin v. California Department of Water Resources et al

Plaintiff: Syed Mohsin
Defendant: California Department of Water Resources, David Gutierrez and Michael Waggoner
Case Number: 2:2013cv01236
Filed: June 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/27/18. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 94 , and DENIES Plaintiff's Counsel Motion to Withdraw as Counsel 80 . (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 2/12/18 GRANTING Plaintiff's Counsel's Motion to file documents under seal. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/8/2018 DENYING 73 Motion for Discovery. (Washington, S)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/2/2018 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Counsel may file the following documents under seal: 1. Ransom Declaration containing attorney client protected information; 2. Attorney Fee Agreement between Plaintiff and Counsel; 3. Plaintiffs Medical Record; 4. Correspondence Relating to Settlement Agreements; and, 5. Correspondence between Counsel and Client that contains protected information. (Hunt, G)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/15/2017 GRANTING 69 Motion to Amend the Scheduling order. ORDERING the scheduling order shall be amended as follows: Fact Discovery Cut-Off Date 1/15/2018; Expert Disclosures and Reports 1/31/201 8; Rebuttal Expert Disclosures 2/15/2018; Dispositive Motion Hearing Cut-Off 5/31/2018; Joint Pretrial Statement 8/16/2018 Final Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 8/23/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley; Jury Trial CONTINUED to 10/29/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. DENYING as MOOT 70 Motion to Shorten Time. (Washington, S)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/28/16 ORDERING that all Discovery shall be completed by 9/29/2017. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 11/30/2017. All dispositive motions, except motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders or other emergency applications, shall be heard no later than 3/22/2018. The Final Pretrial Conference is SET for 6/28/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. The parties shall file, no t later than 6/21/2018, a Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement. A Jury Trial is SET for 8/27/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. The parties estimate a trial length of six to eight (6-8) days. (Kastilahn, A)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/1/16. Plaintiff has no further leave to amend his complaint. (Kastilahn, A)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/17/2015 DENYING 31 Motion to Dismiss as to Counts I, II and III; GRANTING 31 Motion to Dismiss with leave to amend as to Counts IV and V; GRANTING the plaintiff twenty-one (21) days to file an amended complaint if he elects to do so. (Michel, G.)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/4/14: The Court hereby amends its October 1, 2014 Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (ECF No. 26.) Page 16, line 17 of the Order is hereby amended to read, "2. COUNT II is DISMISSED with leave to amend;" consistent with page 7, line 12 of the Order. (Kaminski, H)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/30/14. (Kastilahn, A)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/22/2013 ORDERING 23 Pursuant to Local Rule 271, this Action is referred to Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program (VDRP), the parties anticipate that this process will be completed by 1/31/2014. (Reader, L)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER 15 continuing hearing and Briefing Schedule signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/23/2013. Defendants' 9 Motion to Dismiss Hearing is RE-SET for 10/17/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN). Response to Motion is due 10/3/2013 and Reply now due 10/10/2013. (Marciel, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohsin v. California Department of Water Resources et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Syed Mohsin
Represented By: Marianne Elizabeth Malveaux
Represented By: Yvette Claudia Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Water Resources
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Waggoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?