Truschke v. Flynn et al
Plaintiff: James Edward Truschke, Jr
Defendant: C Xhart, Tod Sommers, Stephen S. Carlton and D Flynn
Case Number: 2:2013cv01255
Filed: June 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 04/02/14 ordering that plaintiff is informed the court will not respond to future filings in this action that are not authorized by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. (Plummer, M)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/20/2013 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/15/2013 ORDERING 5 12 14 15 Motions are DENIED, as they are largely incomprehensive, are not responsive to the court's 7/9/2013 order, and because there is no case or controvers y before the court; Clerk is directed to send plaintiff a new IFP form and 42 USC 1983 form; within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff must submit the IFP (including the required trust account statement) and a complaint; failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Waggoner, D)
July 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/9/2013 DIRECTING the Clerk to send plaintiff an ifp form and a form for filing a civil rights action; plaintiff has 30 days to submit either the filing fee or the application required by § 1915(a); and plantiff has 30 days to submit a complaint.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Truschke v. Flynn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Xhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tod Sommers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen S. Carlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Edward Truschke, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?