Sullivan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Leon E. Sullivan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2013cv01460
Filed: July 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/24/14 DENYING Plaintiff's 16 Motion for Summary Judgment and GRANTING Defendant's 17 Motion for Summary Judgment. CASE CLOSED. (Manzer, C)
January 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/28/2014 ORDERING 14 that plaintiff may have an extension of time to and including 2/26/2014, in which to file a motion for summary judgment or remand; defendants opposition, if any, by 3/25/2014; any replies due by 4/2/2014. (Reader, L)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/6/13 ORDERING the administrative transcript shall be filed no later than 12/4/13, and the scheduling order shall be modified accordingly. (Becknal, R)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/22/2013 GRANTING 2 Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis; The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve the undersigned's scheduling order in Social Security cases. The Cler k of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal. Within fourteen 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM an original and 5 copies each of the completed summons, complaint, s cheduling order, and a completed USM-285 form, and shall file a statement with the court that such documents have been submitted to the USM. The USM is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than 60 days from the date of this order. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon E. Sullivan
Represented By: Steven Gilbert Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Armand D. Roth
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?