Sole v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Annette Sole
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2013cv01650
Filed: August 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1001 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and ORDER 23 to modify 18 Pretrial Scheduling Order signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/12/2014. Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Judgment pursuant to FRCP 52 Hearing is CONTINUED to 8/28/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN). Defendant's Opposition and any Cross-Motion is due 7/24/2014. Plaintiff's Reply and Opposition to any Cross-Motion currently now due 8/7/2014. Defendant's Reply shall now be submitted on 8/21/2014. (Marciel, M)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/6/14 GRANTING 20 Request to Seal filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company; and the Administrative Record, which bears bates-stamps SOLE-PLAN 000001 through SOLE- PLAN 000065 and SOLE CL 000784 through SOLE CL 001201, shall remain protected from public disclosure under seal.(Dillon, M)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/19/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 1 is GRANTED; and this matter is REFERRED back to Judge Nunley. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sole v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Gail E. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Sole
Represented By: David Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?