Connor v. CDC Folsom Mail Room
Plaintiff: Thyrone Connor
Defendant: CDC Folsom Mail Room
Case Number: 2:2013cv01685
Filed: August 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/15/2015 DENYING 16 Motion for Reconsideration. (Zignago, K.)
October 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/7/2014 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed, without prejudice, for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with orders. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due within 14 days.(Yin, K)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/10/2014 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed, without prejudice, for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with court rules and orders. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/14/13 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court is directed to randomly assign a District Judge to this case and to update the docket to reflect the new case number. District Judge John A. Mendez has been randomly assigned to this case.(Dillon, M)
August 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/23/13 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall submit on the form provided by the Clerk of the Court, within 30 days from the date of this order, a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with the required certified copy of his trust account statement, or the appropriate filing fee; and the Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connor v. CDC Folsom Mail Room
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thyrone Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDC Folsom Mail Room
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?