Watts v. Ruggiero et al
Defendant: M Ruggiero, R. S. Marquez, J. Harrison, A. Audette, T. Perez and Campbell
Petitioner: Timothy Watts
Case Number: 2:2013cv01749
Filed: August 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/23/16 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Timothy Watts at 9:00 am in Courtroom 25 before Judge Kendall J. Newman. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD)(Dillon, M)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/20/2016 ORDERING, within 21 days, the parties shall file and serve separate statements that inform the court of the following: 1) Whether court mediation may be helpful in resolving this action, and therefore whether each party requests that a settlement conference be scheduled; 2) If the answer to the prior question is in the affirmative, whether each party waives the disqualification of the undersigned magistrate judge to conduct such s ettlement conference, or requests that another magistrate judge be assigned for that purpose; 3) The anticipated length of jury trial in this action; 4) Any dates through April 2017 when any party may not be available to participate in a settlement conference and/or to appear for pretrial and trial proceedings. (Yin, K)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER adopting in full 43 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/4/16. Defendants' 32 motion for summary judgment is granted on Plaintiff's Eighth and Fourteenth Amendment claims, and on Plaintiff& #039;s First Amendment claims against Defendants Campbell and Audette. Defendants' motion for summary judgment is denied on Plaintiff's First Amendment claim against Defendant Ruggiero. This case is REFERRED back to the assigned magistrate judge for all further pretrial proceedings. (Kastilahn, A)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/9/16 RECOMMENDING that 32 motion for summary judgment should be granted on plaintiff's Eighth and Fourteenth Amendment claims, and on plaintiffs First Amendment cla ims against defendants Campbell and Audette. Defendants' motion for summary judgment should be denied on plaintiff's First Amendment claim against defendant Ruggiero. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/07/15 ordering that within 21 days after the filing date of this order, plaintiff shall file and serve an opposition to the motion for summary judgment or a statement of non-opposition. (Plummer, M)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/23/2014 AFFIRMING the 11/21/2014 28 Order denying plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Marciel, M)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/20/14 ORDERING that plaintiffs motions for the appointment of counsel (ECF Nos. 25 and 27 ) are DENIED.(Dillon, M)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/21/14 ORDERING that The Findings and Recommendations 12 filed on March 24, 2014 are hereby VACATED. Plaintiffs motion for an extension of time 13 to file objections to the now vacated March 2 4, 2014 Findings and Recommendations is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of the Court shall provide to plaintiff a blank summons, a copy of pages 1 through 301 of the complaint filed August 22, 2013, five USM-285 forms and instructions for service of pro cess on defendants Ruggiero, Campbell, Audette, Marquez and Harrison. Plaintiff has thirty days to return the attached Notice of Submission of Documents with the completed summons, the completed USM-285 forms, and six copies of the August 22, 2013 complaint (pages 1 30). Plaintiffs election to proceed without amending his complaint is construed as consent to dismissal without prejudice of plaintiffs defective claims against defendants Chaus and Perez as well as of his claims for equal protection and injunctive relief.(Dillon, M)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/21/14 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 21 days.(Dillon, M)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Timothy Watts signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/29/13. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/29/13 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court, or the appropriate filing fee; Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watts v. Ruggiero et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Timothy Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Ruggiero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. S. Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Audette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?