Haynie v. Biter
Petitioner: Donell Thomas Haynie
Respondent: Martin Biter
Case Number: 2:2013cv01876
Filed: September 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 06/05/15 ORDERING the findings and recommendations issued on 4/10/15 24 are withdrawn. Petitioner's motion to reissue and rehear Amended Habeas Petition 25 is granted. Petitioner's 05/04/15 motion for extension of time to file objections to the 4/10/15 findings and recommendations 26 is denied as unnecessary. Petitioner's motion for default judgment 22 is denied. Also, RECOMMENDING that petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus be denied. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 04/09/15 ORDERING that petitioner's motion for default judgement 22 be denied. Also, RECOMMENDING that petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus be denied. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 01/27/14 granting 6 Motion to Proceed IFP and denying 2 Motion to Stay. Petitioner is granted 30 days from the date of this order in which to file and serve a renewed motion for a stay and abeyance addressing the issues set forth above. (Plummer, M)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/17/13 ORDERING that Petitioner shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis or the appropriate filing fee; Clerk of the Court is directed to send petitioner a copy of the in forma pauperis form used by this district.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynie v. Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donell Thomas Haynie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Martin Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?