Revada v. Heise, et al.
Plaintiff: Dimetri M. Revada
Defendant: R. O'Brien and R. Heise
Case Number: 2:2013cv01941
Filed: September 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/12/13 ORDERING that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Dillon, M)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Dimetri M. Revada signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/22/13. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/23/13 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. (Dillon, M)
September 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TRANSFERRING Case to the SACRAMENTO Division of the Eastern District of California, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/18/13: New Case Number 2:13-cv-01941 KJN (PC). Old Case Number 1:13-cv-01458 SKO (PC).(Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Revada v. Heise, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Heise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dimetri M. Revada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?