Thompson v. Jones et al
Plaintiff: David Allen Thompson, Sr.
Defendant: Scott R. Jones, Rick Pattison, E Buehler, Kevin Steed, McClary and R Bilgeru
Case Number: 2:2013cv01951
Filed: September 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/9/2015 ORDERING that this action against Defendant Suzanne McClary is DISMISSED with prejudice. All parties to bear their own costs and attorneys fees. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/18/15 denying 45 Motion for leave to amend. By July 1, 2015, the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal or a status report as to why dismissal of this action is not yet appropriate. (Dillon, M)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/26/14 ordering the custodian to produce David Allen Thompson on 2/12/15 at 1:00 p.m. in courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD and CMK) (Plummer, M)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/3/14 ORDERING that the findings and recommendations filed April 28, 2014 (ECF No. 24 ), are ADOPTED IN FULL; and defendants Jones, Pattison, Buehler, Steed and Bilgeru are DISMISSED.(Dillon, M)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/28/2014 ORDERING 32 that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend is DENIED. (Reader, L)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/9/14 ORDERING that Plaintiffs request for an extension of time (ECF No. 27 ) is granted. Plaintiff is granted 30 days to return to the court the documents necessary for service of process on defendant McClary. Failure to return the document within 30 days will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs motion requesting a court order for payment of postage for indigent legal mail (ECF No. 26 ) is denied.(Dillon, M)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER and FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/28/14 DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT SERVICE DOCUMENTS and USM-285 Forms within 30 days. Service is appropriate for McClary. Clerk to send plaintiff: 1 Su mmons, 1 USM-285 Form, and 1 copy of the Amended Complaint filed on 2/24/14. It is RECOMMENDED that defendants Jones, Pattison, Buehler, Steed and Bilgeru be dismissed. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/14/14 DENYING 11 Request for Reconsideration of Law Library Access. (Manzer, C)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/02/14 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/1/13 ORDERING the Sheriff of Sacramento County to collect and forward payment from the prison trust account of David Allen Thompson, Sr. to the clerk until the balance of $350 is paid in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Sheriff of Sacramento County. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial ). (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Jones et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Allen Thompson, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott R. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick Pattison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Buehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McClary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Bilgeru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?