Gianelli v. Home Depot Incorporated
Plaintiff: Sheila L. Gianelli
Defendant: Home Depot Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2013cv01969
Filed: September 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/22/16. The Court DENIES Gianelli's MOTION for RECONSIDERATION 64 , DENIES Gianelli's MOTION to AMEND her complaint, and GRANTS Defendant's MOTION to STRIKE 84 from the record and remove from PACER/ECF Exhibits D and F through M attached to Gianelli's declaration in support of her Motion for Reconsideration. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/27/16, ORDERING that Home Depot's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/22/2015 ORDERING that the second session of mediation is to be completed by 3/4/2016. The final session of Plaintiff's deposition is to be completed by 3/25/2016. All dispositive motions shall be filed by 4/19/2016. Hearings on such dispositive motions shall be on 5/17/2016 at 1:30 PM. The parties shall file a joint pretrial statement by 6/17/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/24/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. Trial set for 8/1/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Zignago, K.)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/18/2015 ORDERING 35 The deposition of Eric Schoen shall be substituted for the deposition of Clarence "Al" Adcock ordered 32 ; the deposition of Eric Schoen shall be completed no later than 10/4/ 2015; the deposition of Janice Kring shall be completed by 12/5/2015; the Final session of Plaintiff's deposition is to be completed by 1/15/2016; No other discovery deadlines are hereby modified from this Court's order in 11 , 32 ; all d ispositive motions shall be filed by 2/9/2016; Hearings on such dispositive motions shall be on 3/8/2016 at 1:30 PM; the final pretrial conference is set for 4/22/2016 at 10:00 AM; the parties joint pretrial statement shall be filed no later than 4/15/2016; Trial for this matter is set on 6/6/2016 at 09:00 AM.(Reader, L)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/3/15 ORDERING: (1) The parties are to complete their private mediation process by 7/31/15; (2) The depositions of Janise Kring, Clarence "Al" Adcock, Brian Hitchcock, Anselmo Duenas, Bob Jenki ns, Rob Huerte, Chanden Pen, and Plaintiff shall be completed after mediation and no later than 10/2/15; (3) No other discovery deadlines are hereby modified form this Court's order in Docket No. 11; (4) All dispositive motions shall be file d by 12/4/15; (5) Hearings on such dispositive motions shall be on 1/13/16 at 9:30 a.m; (6) The joint pretrial statement shall be filed on or before 2/26/16; (7) The final pretrial conference is set for 3/4/16 at 11:00 a.m; (8) Trial for this matter is set for 4/11/16 at 9:00 a.m. (Becknal, R)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez GRANTING 29 Stipulated Protective Order. (Michel, G)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/23/2014 DENYING 19 Motion for Reconsideration; DENYING Defendant's Request for Further Sanctions re 20 Opposition. (Michel, G)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/12/2014: The 12 Motion to Compel is DENIED; and reasonable expenses are awarded to defendant in the amount of $1,012.50, said amount to be payable by plaintiff's counsel only. (Owen, K)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/31/14: No later than August 11, 2014, plaintiff shall submit for in camera review unredacted copies of responsive documents for which a claim of attorney client privilege is made, along with copies of the redacted documents previously served on defendant. The documents shall be Bates stamped. Plaintiff shall also at that time serve on defendant and the court a privilege log. The matter shall thereafter stand submitted. (Kaminski, H)
March 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STATUS (Pre-trial Scheduling) ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 3/10/14 ORDERING that all Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 6/3/2015, and hearing on such motions shall be on 7/1/2015 at 9:30 a.m.; all Discovery shall be completed by 4/2 4/2015; Designation of Expert Witnesses is due by 2/20/2015, and any expert rebuttal is due by 2/27/2015; The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 8/14/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez; and the Jury Trial is set for 9/28/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. The parties estimate a trial length of approximately 5 to 7 days. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gianelli v. Home Depot Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila L. Gianelli
Represented By: Don Roabien Dennis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?