Duarte Nursery Inc. et al v. United States Army Corps of Engineers et al

Plaintiff: Duarte Nursery Inc. and John Duarte
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers, Karl E Longley, Jennifer Lester Moffitt, Jon Costantino, Sandra O. Meraz, Carmen Ramirez, Robert Schneider and Pamela Creedon
Case Number: 2:2013cv02095
Filed: October 10, 2013
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Stanislaus
Referring Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2016 246 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/16/16 ORDERING that CIV No. 2:16-cv-01498-WBS-CMK is REASSIGNED from Senior United States District Judge William B. Shubb to the undersigned and from Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kelli son to Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. The caption on documents filed in the REASSIGNED case shall be shown as: CIV 2:16-cv-01498-KJM DB. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 29, 2016 222 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/28/16 ORDERING the pretrial conference, which was previously set for 8/26/16 at 10:00 A.M. and is now reset for 9/2/16 at 10:00 A.M.; the Joint Pretrial Statement and the Motions in limine are due to be filed no later than 8/5/16; Responses are due to be filed no later than 8/15/16; (Optional) replies are due to be filed no later than 8/19/16.(Becknal, R)
June 20, 2016 199 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 197 Motion to Shorten Time signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/20/16: HEARING as to 196 Motion for Reconsideration RESET for 7/1/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Joint pretrial statement due date is CONTINUED to July 29, 2016. Final Pretrial Conference RESET for 8/12/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. The Bench Trial previously set for July 25, 2016 is VACATED to be reset at the Final Pretrial Conference. (Kaminski, H)
June 10, 2016 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/10/2016 GRANTING the United States' Motion for Summary Judgment on the plaintiffs' Due Process claims and on its CWA counterclaim; GRANTING the United States' Motion to Dismiss the plaintiffs' retaliatory prosecution claim WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND. (Michel, G.)
May 3, 2016 188 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/3/2016 ORDERING the parties to file their Joint Pretrial Conference Statement by 6/10/2016; CONTINUING the Final Pretrial Conference to 6/30/2016 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; CONFIRMING the Bench Trial set for 7/25/2016. (Michel, G.)
April 15, 2016 186 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/14/2016 ORDERING that the Joint Pretrial Conference Statement previously due 4/28/2016, is now due 5/11/2016. (Zignago, K.)
November 16, 2015 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/13/2015 ORDERING that the government's 101 motion to withdraw deemed admissions is GRANTED and plaintiffs' 103 request for sanctions is DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
October 19, 2015 106 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER 102 allowing Duarte Nursery and United States to file 3 Motions for Summary Judgment by 10/23/2015 signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/16/2015. Here, the Court is prepared to accept parties' representation that thre e separate Briefs will allow for more clear presentation of issues and separate briefing is not a method by which to avoid Court's limitation on page-length. At the same time, Court is not persuaded that parties require additional pages, over and above what is allowed for anyone Brief. Thus, for each Brief up to a total of three briefs, Courts standing order "plac[ing] a page limit for Dispositive Motions of 20 pages on all initial moving papers," REMAIN IN EFFECT. (Marciel, M)
September 3, 2015 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/2/2015 GRANTING 80 Motion for Leave to Amend the Complaint; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to file the second amended complaint, attached to the plaintiffs' motion, on the docket. (Michel, G.)
May 18, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/15/15. (Manzer, C) Modified on 5/18/2015 (Manzer, C).
March 24, 2015 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/23/15 ORDERING that The United States' motion to dismiss the first, second, and fifth claims as moot is DENIED. The United States' motion to dismiss the sixth claim for failure to state a claim is GRANTED with leave to amend. Plaintiffs are directed to file any second amended complaint consistent with this order within 21 days of the filed date of this order. (Kastilahn, A)
January 30, 2015 58 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/29/15 re: 57 . (Meuleman, A)
August 6, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 8/6/2014 ORDERING 34 Plaintiffs' Motion to file first supplemental complaint; without prejudice to the United States' right to answer or otherwise respond to the first supplemental complaint, the unopposed motion is GRANTED. Further, the motion hearing noticed for 8/11/2014 is VACATED. (Reader, L)
July 8, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/8/2014 ORDERING the defendant to respond to the 34 Motion to file a First Supplemental Complaint by 7/24/2014; CONTINUING the Motion Hearing on the 34 Motion to file a First Supplemental Complaint to 8/11/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Michel, G)
June 3, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 6/2/2014 ORDERING 30 Status Conference Reset for 9/22/2014 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; Status Reports due 14 days prior to conference. (Reader, L)
April 23, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/22/14 ORDERING that The Corps' MOTION to DISMISS for lack of federal jurisdiction 10 is DENIED; The Corps' MOTION to DISMISS for failure to state a claim is DENIED; and The State Defendants& #039; MOTION to DISMISS for lack of federal jurisdiction, 9 is GRANTED. This lawsuit is DISMISSED without prejudice, as to Defendants Longley, Moffitt, Constantino, Meraz, Ramirez, Schneider and Creedon, because the matter is not yet ripe for judicial review. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 24, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/24/2014 CONTINUING the Status Conference to 6/23/2014 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; ORDERING the parties to file further status reports fourteen days prior to that date. (Michel, G)
January 8, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/8/13: Initial Scheduling Conference RESET for 3/24/2014 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duarte Nursery Inc. et al v. United States Army Corps of Engineers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duarte Nursery Inc.
Represented By: Anthony L. Francois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Duarte
Represented By: Anthony L. Francois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army Corps of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl E Longley
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Lester Moffitt
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Costantino
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra O. Meraz
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Ramirez
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Schneider
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Creedon
Represented By: Matthew J. Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?