Cagle v. C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Casey Cagle
Defendant: Tracy Logistics, LLC and C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2013cv02134
Filed: October 15, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/19/14 ORDERING that Defendants' MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings 5 is GRANTED; The Clerk is ordered to enter Judgment for Defendants and close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/18/2014 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 14 Motion to Remand is DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/21/2013 GRANTING 13 Notice of Request to Seal Document(s). Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof and the Declaration of Jonathan M. Lebe in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand shall be filed under seal. (Zignago, K.)
October 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/23/2013 ORDERING that the actions denominated as 2:13-cv-01798-KJM-DAD, 2:13-cv-02134-GEB-EFB, 2:13-cv-02140-TLN-KJN, and 2:13-cv-02175-KJM-AC are REASSIGNED to Chief Judge Morri son C. England, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman for all further proceedings, and any dates currently set in these reassigned cases only are hereby VACATED. The Clerk of the Court is to issue an Order Requiring Joint Status Report. IT IS FU RTHER ORDERED that the action denominated as 2:13-cv-02153-MCE-CKD is REASSIGNED from Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney to Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman for all further proceedings. The caption on documents filed in the reassigned cases shall be shown as: 2:13-cv-01798-MCE-KJN, 2:13-cv-02134-MCE-KJN, 2:13-cv-02140-MCE-KJN, 2:13-cv-02153-MCE-KJN, 2:13-cv-02175-MCE-KJN. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cagle v. C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Brandon Reed McKelvey
Represented By: Jon D. Meer
Represented By: Julie Grace Yap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C&S Wholesale Grocers, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Grace Yap
Represented By: Jon D. Meer
Represented By: Brandon Reed McKelvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Cagle
Represented By: Alexander Russell Wheeler
Represented By: R Rex Parris
Represented By: Jonathan Michael Lebe
Represented By: Edwin Aiwazian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?