Morrow v. Sacramento D.E.A.
Plaintiff: Michael Morrow
Defendant: Sacramento D.E.A.
Case Number: 2:2013cv02188
Filed: October 21, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/7/2014 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(b); and the Clerk be directed to close this case and vacate all dates; 6 Amended Co mplaint filed by Michael Morrow referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. Any party may file objections to these findings and recommendations within 14 days after being served. Failure to timely file objections may waive the right to appeal the District Court's order. (Waggoner, D)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING First Amended COMPLAINT 6 signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/10/14, but such dismissal is with leave to amend so that plaintiff can correct the pleading deficiencies described herein and those described in the cou rt's prior order 4 . Plaintiff is granted 45 days from the entry of this order to file a Second Amended Complaint that is complete in itself. The Second Amended Complaint must bear the docket number assigned to this case and must be labeled Second Amended Complaint. Failure to timely file a Second Amended Complaint in accordance with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH LEAVE TO AMEND signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/25/13. First Amended Complaint due within 45 days. 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. (Manzer, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrow v. Sacramento D.E.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento D.E.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?