Wilson v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Joleen D. Wilson
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2013cv02229
Filed: October 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER 25 for award of Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA) Fees signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/29/2015. Plaintiff is awarded $6,100.00 in attorney fees. (Marciel, M)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/23/2015. Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Defendant's 22 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. The Commissioner's decision is REVERSED. This matter is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this Order. (Marciel, M)
July 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/23/14 ORDERING that Plaintiff is GRANTED an extension of 30 days, through 8/1/2014, to file the Motion for Summary Judgment.(Kastilahn, A)
June 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/19/14 re: 15 GRANTING an Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by 7/21/2014. (Meuleman, A)
January 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/24/14 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 3 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to serve on plaintiff the scheduling order in social security cases. The Clerk of the Court is FURTHER DIRECTED to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the United States Marshal a completed summons and copies of the complaint and file a statemen t with the court that said documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal. The United States Marshal is DIRECTED to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than 60 days from the date of this order. (cc: USM). (Meuleman, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joleen D. Wilson
Represented By: Joseph Clayton Fraulob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of the Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?