Smith v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Smith
Defendant: Administration Employee Staff Social Security and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2013cv02235
Filed: October 25, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/7/2014 ORDERING that the hearing date of 2/26/2014 on defendant's 8 motion to dismiss is VACATED. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court be directed to close this case. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.. Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Zignago, K.)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/10/2014 ORDERING the hearing of 1/22/2014 is VACATED; Motion to Dismiss 8 HEARING Reset for 2/26/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney; plaintiff shall file opposition, if any, to the motion by 2/5/2014; reply, if any, by 2/12/2014.(Reader, L)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/22/2013 GRANTING 6 Ex Parte Application for Extension of Time. Defendant's deadline to respond to the complaint is EXTENDED to 12/16/2013. (Zignago, K.)
October 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/28/13: The United States of America's ex parte application for extension of time to respond to plaintiff's complaint 3 , is hereby APPROVED. Defendant's deadline to respond to the complaint is extended to November 25, 2013. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administration Employee Staff Social Security
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, cv
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, cv
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?