Synthes, Inc. et al v. Knapp
Plaintiff: Synthes Inc and DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc.
Defendant: Gregory Knapp
Counter_claimant: Gregory Knapp
Counter_defendant: DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc. and Synthes Inc
Case Number: 2:2013cv02261
Filed: October 30, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/15/18 ORDERING pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and good cause having been shown, this action is hereby DISMISSED in its entirety with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs, past, present, and future. The Clerk is directed to close this case. CASE CLOSED (Becknal, R)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM, and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 4/18/17, ORDERING that Defendant's 77 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART, and DENIED IN PART. The parties are directed to file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness not later than 90 days after the electronic filing of this Memorandum and Order. (Kastilahn, A)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/13/2017 ORDERING to avoid unnecessary expense to the parties if the pending dispositive motion is granted, the parties respectfully request the Court to extend the time for which the parties must file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness to be within 90 days of the date of the Court's ruling on the pending dispositive motion, with expert depositions to occur within 40 days of the Court's ruling on the pending dispositive motion IT IS SO ORDERED. (Reader, L)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATED ORDER AMENDING PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/2/2017 ORDERING that time is EXTENDED for which the parties must file a Joint Notice of Trial Readiness to be within 90 days of the date of the Court's ruling on the pending dispositive motion, with expert depositions to occur within 40 days of the Court's ruling on the pending dispositive motion. (Jackson, T)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 1/5/2017 GRANTING the parties' 87 Notice of Request to Seal Document(s). Within ten (10) days of the date of this Order, the Parties shall file redacted copies of the following documents on the CM/ECF system Knapp's Undisputed Statement of Facts, Synthes' Response to Knapp's Undisputed Statement of Facts, and Synthes's Statement of Disputed Factsand all accompanying exhibits. (Zignago, K.)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTED and signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 11/9/2016 (ECF No. 83). Plaintiffs' Synthes, Inc.'s and Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc.'s opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 77) is due on November 17, 2016; Defendant Gregory Knapp's Reply in Support of his Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 77) is due December 5, 2016.(Deutsch, S)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 11/3/2016 ORDERING that the Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 filed by Gregory Knapp is GRANTED in PART. (Reader, L)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/30/2016 EXTENDING the date for designating a supplement list of expert witnesses through 9/30/2016 in order to permit the parties to exchange information and prepare related reports. (Jackson, T)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/3/15: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 4/13/2016. Discovery due by 2/12/2016. Dispositive Motions filed by 8/18/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. Jury Trial set for 2/13/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Chief Judge Morrison C. England Jr.. (Kaminski, H)
March 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/6/15 ORDERING that 46 Motion to Compel is granted as more fully stated on the record. (Dillon, M)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 2/12/15: If the Court denies the 46 Motion, then fact discovery will be extended until sixty days from the date of that Order; or if the Court grants the Motion, then fact discovery will be extended until eighty days from the date of that Order. (Kaminski, H)
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION and ORDER ON AGREEMENT FOR THE DISCOVERY OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION FROM K2M, INC. signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/16/14 43 . (Meuleman, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synthes, Inc. et al v. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synthes Inc
Represented By: Andrew B. Cohen, PHV
Represented By: Scott F. Cooper, PHV
Represented By: Anthony B. Haller, PHV
Represented By: Kathy PourSanae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew B. Cohen, PHV
Represented By: Scott F. Cooper, PHV
Represented By: Anthony B. Haller, PHV
Represented By: Kathy PourSanae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Knapp
Represented By: James P. Mayo
Represented By: John P McShea, PHV
Represented By: Malcolm S. Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Gregory Knapp
Represented By: James P. Mayo
Represented By: John P McShea, PHV
Represented By: Malcolm S. Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew B. Cohen, PHV
Represented By: Scott F. Cooper, PHV
Represented By: Anthony B. Haller, PHV
Represented By: Kathy PourSanae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Synthes Inc
Represented By: Andrew B. Cohen, PHV
Represented By: Scott F. Cooper, PHV
Represented By: Anthony B. Haller, PHV
Represented By: Kathy PourSanae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?