May 5, 2016 |
Filing
54
ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/4/16 ORDERING that Defendants' motion to confirm arbitration award is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
|
September 4, 2015 |
Filing
49
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/4/2015 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 47 substitution of attorney is APPROVED. This matter, including defendants' pending 44 motion to confirm the arbitration award, is REFERRED to the United States District Judge assigned to this action. All dates pending before the undersigned are VACATED. Defendants shall contact the courtroom deputy for the assigned District Judge to select a hearing date for their pending motion to confirm the arbitration award. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in this action shall be No. 2:13-cv-2283-TLN-KJN. (Zignago, K.)
|
July 28, 2015 |
Filing
46
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/28/2015. Defendants' 44 Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award Hearing is CONTINUED to 9/10/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN). Plaintiff shall file written Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition on or before 8/27/2015. Defendants may file written Reply to plaintiff's Opposition, if any, on or before 9/3/2015.(Marciel, M)
|
June 26, 2015 |
Filing
43
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/26/15 ORDERING that Defendants' 27 motion to strike is GRANTED. The documents filed at ECF Nos. 24 , 25 , and 26 are STRICKEN from the record and will not be considered by the cou rt for any purpose other than a renewed motion for Rule 11 sanctions filed by defendants. Defendants' 28 motion for Rule 11 sanctions is DENIED without prejudice to a later renewal if plaintiff continues to make baseless filings while this action is stayed pending arbitration. Plaintiff's 34 , 36 , motions to quash are DENIED. Plaintiff's documents filed at ECF Nos. 23 , 29 , and 41 are STRICKEN from the record sua sponte and will not be considered by the court for any purpose. (Kastilahn, A)
|
June 22, 2015 |
Filing
40
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/22/15 ORDERING The court hereby approves the Request for Telephonic Appearance by counsel for Defendants Cinch Bakery Equipment LLC and Cindy Chananie, to appear at the hearing on the pending c ross-motions in the above-captioned matter, scheduled for June 25, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for Defendants, Aaron P. Rudin, is directed to be available by telephone at (213) 576-5085 at least ten minutes prior to the scheduling hearing time. (Becknal, R)
|
May 22, 2015 |
Filing
33
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/22/2015 CONTINUING the Motion Hearing on 27 Motion to Strike, 28 Motion for Sanctions to 6/25/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman; ORDERIN G the plaintiff to file written oppositions, or statements of non-opposition to said motions by 6/11/2015; CAUTIONING the plaintiff that a failure to file written oppositions will be deemed a statement on non-opposition to both pending motions and consent to the granting of both motions, and shall constitute an additional ground for the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including a possible recommendation that the plaintiff's entire case be involuntarily dismissed with prejudice pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 41(b); ORDERING the defendants to file any written replies by 6/18/2015. (Michel, G.)
|
May 21, 2015 |
Filing
32
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/21/2015 GRANTING 31 Request for Telephonic Appearance at the Motion Hearing on 27 Motion to Strike, 28 Motion for Sanctions set for 5/28/2015 at 10:00 AM; DIRECTING Defendants' counsel, Aaron P. Rudin, to be available by telephone at (213) 576-5085 at least ten minutes prior to the scheduled hearing time. (Michel, G.)
|
January 10, 2014 |
Filing
12
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 4 Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/10/14: Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order upon the two non-appearing defendants, namely, "Backtechnic Si.I" and "Gerd Mang," by certified mail. The initial scheduling conference currently set for April 3, 2014, is hereby vacated in light of the stay. (Kaminski, H)
|
December 3, 2013 |
Filing
7
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/3/13: HEARING as to 4 MOTION to DISMISS is CONTINUED to 1/9/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Plaintiff shall file a written opposition to the motion, or a statement of non- opposition thereto, on or before December 16, 2013. Defendants may file a written reply to plaintiff's opposition, if any, on or before December 23, 2013. (Kaminski, H)
|