Cox v. Rackley
Petitioner: Daniel Cox
Respondent: Ronald J. Rackley
Case Number: 2:2013cv02356
Filed: October 17, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying petitioner's 46 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/7/15. The Clerk shall notify the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of this order. (Kastilahn, A)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/27/2015 ORDERING petitioner's 39 notice of appeal is STRICKEN as premature; and petitioner's 40 motion for certificate of appealability is DENIED as premature. (Yin, K)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/7/15 RECOMMENDING that petitioners application for a writ of habeas corpus be denied; and the District Court decline to issue a certificate of appealability. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/28/14 ORDERING that Respondents request for withdrawal of his motion to dismiss, filed January 21, 2014 (ECF No. 13 ) is granted; Respondents request for extension of time in which to file a response to the petition is granted; and Respondent shall file a response to the petition on or before June 6, 2014. (Dillon, M)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/21/2014 ORDERING respondent to file further briefing on the issue raised in this order, within 14 days.(Yin, K)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/11/14 ORDERING that within 14 days of this order, respondent shall file the evidence.(Dillon, M)
November 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/12/13. CASE TRANSFERRED TO SACRAMENTO Division. New Case Number: 2:13-cv-2356 GGH (HC) Old Case Number: 1:13-cv-1676 JLT (HC).(Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Rackley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald J. Rackley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?