McCloud v. Farrow et al
Plaintiff: Shana McCloud
Defendant: Joseph A. Farrow
Case Number: 2:2013cv02404
Filed: November 19, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/22/15: The Court hereby modifies its Status Order as follows: Last Day for Expert disclosure: January 12, 2016. Last Day for Supplemental and rebuttal expert disclosure: January 19, 2016. (Kaminski, H)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION and ORDER 40 signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/4/15 ORDERING the Court hereby modifies its 6/2/15 Status Order as follows: Last Day for Expert disclosure: 1/5/16; Last Day for Supplemental and rebuttal expert disclosure: 1/12/16. (Becknal, R)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STATUS (Pre-trial Scheduling) ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/1/15: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 12/4/2015. Discovery due by 2/5/2016. Dispositive Motions filed by 3/9/2016. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/2016 at 11:00 AM before Judge John A. Mendez. Jury Trial set for 6/27/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Kaminski, H)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/3/14. (Kaminski, H)
November 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying 23 Motion to Dismiss signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/13/14. (Kaminski, H)
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/7/2014 ORDERING The Complaint is hereby DISMISSED with leave to amend within 30 days of the date of this order; and Defendant's 4 motion to dismiss, is DENIED as MOOT. (Reader, L)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/27/2014 DISCHARGING 11 Order to Show Cause. (Michel, G)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/24/14 ORDERING Counsel for plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing why it should not be sanctioned in accordance with Local Rule 110, including a fine of $150, and/or an order dismissing the lawsuit, for its failure to respond to the dismissal motion in a timely manner. Counsel for plaintiff shall file its written response to this Order To Show Cause within seven (7) calendar days of the issuance of this order. The hearing on the motion to dismiss (ECF No. 4 ), is CONTINUED to April 7, 2014 at 10:00 a.m; Defendant shall file his reply to plaintiff's opposition to the motion to dismiss, if any, no later than March 17, 2014 at 4:30 p.m. (Becknal, R)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on January 30, 2014 re 3 . The Initial Scheduling Conference set for 02/03/2014 is RESET TO 4/21/2014 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. All parties shall file status reports not later than fourteen days prior to that date. The parties are reminded that sanctions may be imposed for failure to file status reports as required by this order. (Rivas, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCloud v. Farrow et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shana McCloud
Represented By: John L. Burris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph A. Farrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?