Sciosciole v. Gower
Petitioner: Edward Francis Sciosciole
Respondent: Gower
Case Number: 2:2013cv02438
Filed: November 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/01/18 DENYING 74 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. (Plummer, M)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/10/2018 DENYING 69 Motion to Re-Open this Case. (Henshaw, R)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/14/17 DENYING 45 motion to reopen habeas action. (Plummer, M)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/6/2017 GRANTING 52 Motion for Extension of Time. Respondent's opposition to 45 Motion to Reopen Case to be filed on or before 6/30/2017. (Henshaw, R)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 04/10/17 ordering that respondent shall file a response to petitioner's motion within 21 days. Petitioner may file a reply within 21 days after service of the response. (Plummer, M)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren on 8/4/16 ORDERING that the Court DENIES the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/26/15 ORDERING that Petitioners motion for leave to file an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus 30 is denied; Petitioners amended petition for writ of habeas corpus 26 is stricken ; Petitioner is granted 30 days within which to file a motion to stay this action which conforms with the requirements listed above; and Petitioners failure to file a motion to stay which conforms to the requirements of this order within 30 days will result in this matter proceeding on petitioners original petition for writ of habeas corpus.(Dillon, M)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 916/2014 GRANTING petitioner 30 days to file a motion for leave to amend his petition for writ of habeas corpus in accordance with this order; if petitioner files a motion for leave to amend, respondent shall file an opposition within 14 days of service and petitioner may file a reply within 14 days of service of the opposition. If a motion is not filed within 30 days, the court will proceed on the original petition. (Yin, K)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/23/14 denying 13 Motion to Stay. Petitioner is granted 30 days within which to file a motion for leave to file an amended petition for writ of habeas corpus. If petitioner elects to file a motion to amend, he must include a copy of his proposed amended petition. If no motion to amend is filed within 30 days, the court will proceed on petitioner's original petition. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sciosciole v. Gower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edward Francis Sciosciole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?