Breining et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Fred Breining and Cathy Breining
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2013cv02441
Filed: November 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/12/2018 GRANTING 45 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Designation. (Zignago, K.)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/28/2018 ORDERING the First and Second Causes of Action are DISMISSED without prejudice, and DENYING 36 Motion for Summary Judgment as to the Third Cause of Action. (Washington, S)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/25/2015 GRANTING 17 Motion to Dismiss; GRANTING the plaintiffs leave to amend the 16 First Amended Complaint; WARNING the plaintiffs that a failure to cure the deficiencies highlighted herein wil l result in dismissal with prejudice; ORDERING the plaintiffs to file and serve a Second Amended Complaint within 14 days; ORDERING the defendants to respond to the Second Amended Complaint within 21 days of service of said amended complaint. (Michel, G.)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/24/14 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' REQUEST to continue the hearing date and/or to file a late opposition 22 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/8/14 ORDERING that Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint is GRANTED; Plaintiffs are given leave to amend and shall file and serve a First Amended Complaint within 14 days of entry of this Order; Defendants shall file their responsive pleading within 21 days of service of the First Amended Complaint. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breining et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Breining
Represented By: Janice D. Dudensing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Breining
Represented By: Janice D. Dudensing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Edward Rick Buell, III
Represented By: Jon David Ives
Represented By: John B. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?