Ridge Top Ranch, LLC v. United States Fish & Wildlife Service et al
Plaintiff: Ridge Top Ranch, LLC
Defendant: United States Fish & Wildlife Service and Daniel M. Ashe
Case Number: 2:2013cv02462
Filed: November 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16 U.S.C. ยง 1538
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 3/3/14. (Kaminski, H)
February 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/19/2014 ORDERING that a responsive pleading be filed within twenty-eight (28) days of the Court's ruling on the 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction or within twenty-eight (28) days of the filing of any amended complaint. (Michel, G)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/3/2014 ORDERING 21 Order is AMENDED as follows: paragraph at lines 13:27 - 14:11 are STRICKEN and REPLACED with a paragraph that reads: What remains is that portion of the proposed preliminary injun ction which would enjoin the defendants from taking any action that would directly or indirectly grant approval for Caltrans and/or the [STA] to obtain the mitigation described in the [RFP], including habitat mitigation for the California red-legged frog, from any source other than Ridge Top. (Proposed Order 2.) It would be proper for the court to enter an injunction in nearly this form, omitting only the words other than Ridge Top. If the court were to enter this injunction, FWS would be unabl e to approve either the Ridge Top Proposal or any other proposal until the court reached a determination on the merits of Ridge Tops claims. Such relief would preserve the status quo pending a determination on the merits, and as such, appears appropriate. (Waggoner, D)
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/31/2014 DIRECTING Defendants to file a sur-reply by 2/7/2014 at 4:30p and SETTING 10 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION for Hearing on 2/21/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton. (Donati, J)
January 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/23/2014 ORDERING 10 That the hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction is VACATED. An order will be forthcoming. (Reader, L)
January 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 1/6/2014 ORDERING, for administrative reasons, 10 Motion Hearing RESET for 1/31/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4 (LKK) before Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; deadline for filing a reply, if any (1/6/2014) remains unchanged. (Waggoner, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ridge Top Ranch, LLC v. United States Fish & Wildlife Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish & Wildlife Service
Represented By: Jeremy Scott Hessler
Represented By: Bridget Kennedy McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel M. Ashe
Represented By: Jeremy Scott Hessler
Represented By: Bridget Kennedy McNeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ridge Top Ranch, LLC
Represented By: Anthony J. Cortez
Represented By: Jerry Stouck, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?