United States of America v. Real Property located at 5400 Horizon Court, Placerville, California, El Dorado County, et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property Located at 5400 Horizon Court, Placerville, California, El Dorado County
Claimant: Judith A Klaisle
Case Number: 2:2013cv02473
Filed: November 26, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: El Dorado
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/10/2015. (Zignago, K.)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/12/2015. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR PUBLICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/20/13. (Meuleman, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property located at 5400 Horizon Court, Placerville, California, El Dorado County, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 5400 Horizon Court, Placerville, California, El Dorado County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Judith A Klaisle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?