Haraszewski v. Knipp
Plaintiff: H. Dymitri Haraszewski
Defendant: Knipp
Case Number: 2:2013cv02494
Filed: December 2, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 08/19/19 GRANTING 82 Motion to opt out and the stay of this action is lifted. By separate order, the court will set a schedule for this case. (Plummer, M)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/11/19 REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS. The plaintiff shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. (cc: assigned Deputy Attorney General) (Plummer, M)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/10/19 ADOPTING the findings and recommendations filed 12/26/18 in full; GRANTING Defendant Austin's motion to dismiss (ECF No. 58 ); and DISMISSING Plaintiff's due process claim against Austin in the third amended complaint without leave to amend. (Becknal, R)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/26/2018 DENYING 69 Request to File a Sur-Reply, STRIKING 70 Sur-Reply, and RECOMMENDING that 58 Motion to Dismiss be granted and that Plaintiff's due process claim against Defendant Austin in 42 Third Amended Complaint be dismissed without leave to amend. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Huang, H)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 07/30/18 ORDERING that within 20 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall show cause why this case should not be dismissed for his failure to file an opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss. (Plummer, M)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER adopting in full 51 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/25/18. Plaintiff's claims against defendants B. Alkire, J. Lizarraga, and P. Vanni are DISMISSED. (Kastilahn, A)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/27/2018 ORDERING the 43 Order filed 11/7/2017 is VACATED; the 47 Order, Findings and Recommendations filed 12/28/2017 is VACATED; plaintiff's 46 motion to amend is GRANTED. This case will proceed on the claims stated in this order and service is appropriate for defendants Austin, Casagrande, Dowdy, Garcia, Lucca, Reese, Sherlock, and Sepulveda. The Clerk shall send plaintiff forms for service t o be completed and returned within 30 days, along with the Notice of Submission. IT IS RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's claims against defendants B. Alkire, J. Lizarraga, and P. Vanni be dismissed. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (See Order for Details)(Yin, K)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/27/2017 GRANTING 46 Motion to Amend the Complaint; DIRECTING Clerk of Court to assign a district judge to this case; ORDERING Defendant Lucca added to this acti on and service of 42 Third Amended Complaint is appropriate on Lucca; DIRECTING Plaintiff to submit service documents and USM-285 Forms; and RECOMMENDING Plaintiff's claims against defendants Alkire, Lizarraga, Vanni, Sepulveda, and unnamed de fendants, except Lucca, be dismissed. Service is appropriate for Lucca and Plaintiff to submit service documents and Notice of Submission previously provided by 1/15/2018 with added defendant Lucca. Assigned and referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/11/2017 GRANTING 44 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff granted up to and including 1/15/2018 to submit service documents and identifying information of the ISU officer. (Henshaw, R)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/5/2017 DENYING plaintiff's 35 request for "ongoing PLU status" and GRANTING plaintiff's 39 motion for an extension of time. Plaintiff shall file a third amended complaint within 21 days. No further extensions of time will be granted. If plaintiff fails to file a timely third amended complaint, this case will be dismissed. (Yin, K)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/07/17 ordering the 2/06/17 second amended complaint 32 is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall file a third amended complaint within 30 days from the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/14/16 granting 27 Motion for Reconsideration. The 12/16/15 Screening Order 16 is vacated. The 11/12/15 first amended complaint 14 is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint within 30 days from the date of this order. Plaintiff's ex parte motion to proceed under seal 28 is denied. (Plummer, M)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/3/2016 GRANTING plaintiff's 20 request to amend; and plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint within 30 days. (Yin, K)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/25/16 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court shall send plaintiff a copy of the amended complaint filed November 12, 2015. Within 30 days, plaintiff shall submit to the court the copies of the amended complaint required to effect service. Failure to return the copies within the specified time period will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed.(Dillon, M)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/26/15 ordering the original complaint is dismissed. Plaintiff is granted 30 days in which to file a first amended complaint. Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis 2 is granted. Plaintiff's motion to amend 9 is granted and, as noted, plaintiff shall have 30 days to file a first amended complaint. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haraszewski v. Knipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H. Dymitri Haraszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knipp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?