Vassel v. Carson Helicopters, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Matthew John Vassel
Defendant: Carson Helicopters, Inc., Carson Helicopter Services, Inc., Steve Metheny and Levi Phillips
Case Number: 2:2013cv02520
Filed: December 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Trinity
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 JUDGMENT dated *5/10/18* in favor of Plaintiff Houston Casualty Company against Matthew John Vassel pursuant to ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/10/18. Each party to bear his and its own fees and costs. The remainder of this action against DOES 1-10 is hereby dismissed, and this action is hereby concluded in its entirety, all parties to bear their own fees and costs. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/6/2017. (Michel, G.)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATED JUDGMENT and ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/24/15 ORDERING that judgment is entered, in case no. 2:14-cv-01377-KJM-CMK (ONLY), in favor of Plaintiff Houston Casualty Company and against Defendant Levi Phillips. Each party is to bear its own costs and fees. Defendant Levi Phillips is TERMED from the 2:14-cv-01377-KJM-CMK case. (Kastilahn, A)
October 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/28/2014 GRANTING 38 Motion to Stay pending resolution of the criminal suit against him in the District of Oregon. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a status report within 30 days of the date of this order, reporting on the progress of the Oregon prosecution and every 30 days thereafter until the criminal case is concluded. CASE STAYED.(Donati, J)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/6/2014 RELATING this case to case no. 2:14-cv-01377 JAM CKD; REASSIGNING the related case to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to make the appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Michel, G)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/12/2014 ORDERING 35 Clerk's Entry of Default against defendant Steve Metheny is SET ASIDE. (Waggoner, D)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/13/14 ORDERING that defendants 12 , 13 motions to dismiss are DENIED. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vassel v. Carson Helicopters, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew John Vassel
Represented By: Troy Douglas Mudford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carson Helicopters, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carson Helicopter Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Metheny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levi Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?