Wilson v. City of West Sacramento et al
Plaintiff: Rebecca Wilson
Defendant: City of West Sacramento, Sergio Alvarez and Dan Drummond
Case Number: 2:2013cv02550
Filed: December 9, 2013
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION and ORDER for Dismissal of Action With Prejudice 72 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/29/2016: The parties, through their respective counsel, hereby stipulate that this matter shall be dismissed in its entirety and with prejudice. It is further stipulated that each party will bear its own costs, including all attorney's fees. Civil Case Terminated. CASE CLOSED. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/14/2016 ORDERING 68 that plaintiff's motion to approve the settlement of her claims be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. 67 (Reader, L)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 63 PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Rebecca Wilson signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/6/2015. (Michel, G.)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/23/2015 CONTINUING the In Camera Hearing re appointment of a guardian ad litem to 10/16/2015 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Michel, G.)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/11/15 ORDERING that A Status Conference is SCHEDULED for 8/26/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION and PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/4/2015. (Zignago, K.)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION and ORDER 42 for continuance of hearing signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/27/2015. Settlement Conference is RE-SET for 5/8/2015 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) due to unavailability of counsel. (Marciel, M)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER upon 38 Stipulation signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/5/2015 resetting pretrial and trial dates as follows: Discovery deadline due by 10/15/2015; Expert Disclosure deadline due by 12/15/2015; Completion of Expert Discovery due b y 2/1/2016; Last day to file Dispositive Motions by 2/28/2016; Final Pretrial Conference is reset for 5/9/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb; and Jury Trial is reset for 8/2/2016 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Kirksey Smith, K)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/26/15 re: 34 CONTINUING Settlement Conference from 4/6/15 to 5/8/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. (Meuleman, A)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/5/15 ORDERING that the Pretrial dates scheduled in this case are CONTINUED as follows: Discovery deadline 3/30/2015. Expert Disclosure 5/18/2015; Complete Expert Discovery 6/8/2015. Last day to file dispositive Motions 6/29/2015. Settlement Conference SET for 4/6/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/4/15 ORDERING that Defendants' MOTION to COMPEL 29 is GRANTED, and the 2/11/15 hearing on the Motion is VACATED. Defendants may, if they choose, and no later than 30 days from the date of this order, move pursuant to FRCP 37(a)(5) for reasonable attorneys' fees and costs incurred in connection with the motion to compel. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/19/14. (Manzer, C)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/22/2014: IT IS ORDERED that the City of West Sacramento and Chief Drummond's 14 Motion to dismiss plaintiff's fourth, fifth, and sixth claims be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Plaintiff has twenty days from the date this Order is signed to file an amended complaint, if she can do so consistent with this Order. (Kirksey Smith, K)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/14/14 APPOINTING Heatherlyn Bevard as Guardian Ad Litem for Rebecca Wilson. (Manzer, C)
January 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/9/2014 ORDERING that the actions denominated Gilliam v. City of West Sacramento, Civ. No. 2:13-2276 WBS AC, and Wilson v. City of West Sacramento, Civ. No. 2:13-2550 KJM EFB are RELATED and the case denominated Wilson v. City of West Sacramento, Civ. No. 2:13-2550 KJM EFB, shall be REASSIGNED to the Honorable William B. Shubb and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. Any dates currently set in the reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. Henceforth, the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as Wilson v. City of West Sacramento, Civ. No. 2:13-2550 WBS AC. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. City of West Sacramento et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Wilson
Represented By: Stewart Lee Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of West Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?